DAVIS et al v. PAULSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00447-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2019 at 1:39 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AILEEN JOY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo BRIAN KIMBALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo CEDRIC SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo CLARENCE SANDERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo HIRAM VEGA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo JAMES RORIE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo Julius Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo KENETH DICKENS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo KENNETH MORRIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo LINCOLN ASHE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo NATHANIEL TAYLOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo PAUL WALKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo ROBERT WALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo SHOON MAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo VIRGINIA TISNIO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
No Logo Wayne Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Uduak James Ubom +1 202 723 8900 +1 202 723 5790 ubomlawgroup@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo CHRISTOPHER COOCH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 John Peter Tavana +1 202 616 5309 +1 202 514 8780 John.Tavana@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID LINDSEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chief, Bureau of Engraving
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chief, Bureau of Engraving
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Chief, Bureau of Engraving
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chief, Bureau of Engraving
TERMINATED: 01/28/2013 John Peter Tavana +1 202 616 5309 +1 202 514 8780 John.Tavana@usdoj.gov
No Logo Henry M. Paulson, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury
TERMINATED: 03/10/2009 Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury
TERMINATED: 03/10/2009 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury
TERMINATED: 03/10/2009 John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, U.S. Department of Treasury
TERMINATED: 03/10/2009 John Peter Tavana +1 202 616 5309 +1 202 514 8780 John.Tavana@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS A. FERGUSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2008 Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2008 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/09/2008 John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2008 John Peter Tavana +1 202 616 5309 +1 202 514 8780 John.Tavana@usdoj.gov
No Logo TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clavijo, Mario Comin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/15/2012 Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/06/2013 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Peter Tavana +1 202 616 5309 +1 202 514 8780 John.Tavana@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/14/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $100000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (154) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Sever
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 54 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The fact discovery deadline is extended to July 14, 2014. A further status conference is set for June 13, 2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson, and all of the named plaintiffs must attend the conference. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/13/2014. (lckbj3) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting a status conference for 5/13/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/5/2014. (lckbj3) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Modify March 6, 2014 Scheduling Order by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Modify October 21, 2103 Scheduling Order by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of CLARIFICATION by LINCOLN ASHE, WAYNE CLARK, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, KENETH DICKENS, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, AILEEN JOY, BRIAN KIMBALL, SHOON MAK, KENNETH MORRIS, JAMES RORIE, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, JULIUS SMITH, NATHANIEL TAYLOR, VIRGINIA TISNIO, HIRAM VEGA, PAUL WALKER, ROBERT WALL (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER lifting the stay and amending the 46 Scheduling Order. See attached order for details. A further status conference is set for 6/14/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/18/2013. (lckbj3) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Restoration of Funds For The Federal Government and Proposed Schedule by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Stay by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. See attached order for details. Plaintiffs are ordered to provide a notice of clarification of remaining claims by 10/18/2013. A further status conference is set for 6/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/23/2013. (lckbj3) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing parties to file a joint report by 7/19/2013. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/21/2013. (lckbj3) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Continue AMENDED by LINCOLN ASHE, WAYNE CLARK, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, KENETH DICKENS, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, AILEEN JOY, BRIAN KIMBALL, SHOON MAK, KENNETH MORRIS, JAMES RORIE, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, JULIUS SMITH, NATHANIEL TAYLOR, VIRGINIA TISNIO, HIRAM VEGA, PAUL WALKER, ROBERT WALL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Reschedule by LINCOLN ASHE, WAYNE CLARK, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, KENETH DICKENS, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, AILEEN JOY, BRIAN KIMBALL, SHOON MAK, KENNETH MORRIS, JAMES RORIE, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, JULIUS SMITH, NATHANIEL TAYLOR, VIRGINIA TISNIO, HIRAM VEGA, PAUL WALKER, ROBERT WALL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Cuong Truong on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Mercedeh Momeni (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting an initial scheduling conference for May 10, 2013 at 9:45 a.m. The parties shall file their Joint Rule 16.3 statement no later than May 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/3/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint, by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint, filed by SHOON MAK, WAYNE CLARK, LINCOLN ASHE, AILEEN JOY, HIRAM VEGA, ROBERT WALL, NATHANIEL TAYLOR, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR., BRIAN KIMBALL, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, PAUL WALKER, CEDRIC SMITH, KENNETH MORRIS.(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 25 Amended Complaint, Nunc Pro Tunc by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion 31 for partial dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/28/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Peter Tavana on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michelle Lo (Tavana, John) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 33 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by CHRISTOPHER COOCH, DAVID LINDSEY, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER. (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR re 32 Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER to show cause in writing by November 5, 2009 why the defendants' motion to dismiss should not be granted as conceded. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk mail a copy of this Order to all of the named plaintiffs at their addresses of record. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/26/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Part by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frederick Whittington, # 2 Exhibit A-C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 25 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 25 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR. (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER. (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Out of Time by TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER COOCH, DAVID LINDSEY, TIMOTHY F. GEITHNER filed by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR.(nmw, ) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lo on behalf of all defendants (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Proposed Order by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR re 21 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Motion (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Proposed Order by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR re 20 Memorandum in Opposition, (Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 4/3/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Motion by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR (Ubom, Uduak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2009: # 1 Exhibit Opposition) (jf, ). (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint/More Definite Statement)(Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 4/3/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by HENRY M. PAULSON, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Response to the Complaint Out of Time by HENRY M. PAULSON, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of all defendants (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney General. (Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 12/17/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR Supplemental. (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Reissue Summons and Serve U.S. Attorney General by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR. (Ubom, Uduak) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing plaintiffs to supplement their response to the November 3, 2008 order and show cause in writing by December 1, 2008 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to all plaintiffs at their current addresses of record. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/20/08. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Ubom, Uduak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10 by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 11/19/2008 to add link number (ks). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [3] by GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR. (Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 8/18/2008 (ks, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing plaintiffs to show cause in writing by November 14, 2008 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution.Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/3/08. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID LINDSEY served on 8/14/2008, answer due 9/3/2008 (Ubom, Uduak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER COOCH served on 8/14/2008, answer due 9/3/2008 (Ubom, Uduak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to HENRY M. PAULSON, JR served on 8/14/2008, answer due 10/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Ubom, Uduak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General August 14, 2008. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Ubom, Uduak)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 8/15/2008. (zlin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER instructing plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE by August 15, 2008 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/5/08. (lcrwr2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Summons Reissued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (6) REISSUED as to HENRY M. PAULSON, JR, CHRISTOPHER COOCH, THOMAS A. FERGUSON, DAVID LINDSEY, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mmh, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Requesting New Summons be Issued by GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR as to HENRY M. PAULSON, JR, CHRISTOPHER COOCH, THOMAS A. FERGUSON, DAVID LINDSEY. (Ubom, Uduak) Modified on 6/26/2008 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against HENRY M. PAULSON, JR, CHRISTOPHER COOCH, THOMAS A. FERGUSON, DAVID LINDSEY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616010976) filed by HIRAM VEGA, CHRISTOPHER HEYWARD, KENNETH MORRIS, VIRGINIA TISNIO, SHOON MAK, JAMES RORIE, KENETH DICKENS, AILEEN JOY, GREGORY O. DAVIS, SR, ARTHUR HAYNESWORTH, CLARENCE SANDERS, CEDRIC SMITH, PAUL WALKER, BRIAN KIMBALL, ROBERT WALL, WAYNE CLARK, NATHANIEL TAYLOR LINCOLN ASHE, JULIUS SMITH. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) Modified on 3/20/2008 (cp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (6) Issued as to HENRY M. PAULSON, JR, CHRISTOPHER COOCH, THOMAS A. FERGUSON, DAVID LINDSEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?