CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00478-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2016 at 5:39 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Stanwood Herrick +1 305 858 2332 +1 305 858 6347 pherrick1@comcast.net
v.
United States Customs & Border Protection United States Customs & Border Protection, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/20/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-01648-RMC
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001792618. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judgment. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/22/09. (KD) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
      REPLY re 25 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
        Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, And/Or Relief From A Judgment Or Order MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, And/Or Relief From A Judgment Or Order filed by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Strike In Part, the Declarations of Peter S. Herrick and the PIERS Declarations filed by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kidwell, Judith)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Reply to Document
              REPLY re [16] Memorandum in Opposition filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. (Herrick, Peter)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, And/Or Relief From A Judgment Or Order by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Strike In Part, the Declarations of Peter S. Herrick and the PIERS Declarations filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Order)(Herrick, Peter)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying as moot 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 13 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/9/08. (KD) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                      Memorandum in opposition to [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (tg, ) (See Docket Entries [14] and [15] to view document)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/9/08. (KD) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Response to Document
                          RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AS TO WHICH THERE ARE NO GENUINE ISSUES re [14] REPLY/OPPOSITION filed by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kidwell, Judith) Modified to add linkage on 8/13/2008 (tg, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss, [9]MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kidwell, Judith) Modified to correct linkage on 8/13/2008 (tg, ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Motion to Strike
                                MOTION to Strike In Part, the Declarations of Peter S. Herrick and the PIERS Declarations by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response due by 8/12/2008. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/1/2008. (cdw)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [12] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its opposition/reply no later than August 12, 2008. It is further ordered that Plaintiff shall file its reply no later than September 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/24/08. (lcrmc2)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Statement Of Material Facts As To Which There Are No Genuine Issues, # (2) Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, # (3) Declaration of Peter S. Herrick, # (4) Piers Declaration, # (5) Order)(Herrick, Peter)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment, [9] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. (Attachments: # (1) Statement Of Material Facts As To Which There Is A Genuine Issue, # (2) Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, # (3) Declaration of Peter S. Herrick, # (4) Piers Declaration, # (5) Order)(Herrick, Peter)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (tg, ) (See Docket Entry number [8] to view document).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Suzuki Declaration and Exhibits)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Order
                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER approving the parties' Proposed Joint Briefing Schedule [7]. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a dispositive motion no later than June 30, 2008; Plaintiff shall file an opposition/cross-motion no later than July 15, 2008; Defendant shall file an opposition/reply no later than July 30, 2008; and Plaintiff may file a reply no later than August 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/20/08. (lcrmc2)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION Proposed Joint Briefing Schedule by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule due by 5/23/2008. (cdw)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Order
                                                      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Parties are directed to submit a joint proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule no later than May 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/2/08. (lcrmc2)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Answer
                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER.(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 3/28/2008, answer due 5/27/2008 (Herrick, Peter) Modified to reflect party served on 4/10/2008 (tg, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                              LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER (tg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. Case related to Case No. 04-1648. (tg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011147) filed by CUSTOMS & INTERNATIONAL TRADE NEWSLETTER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                    Summons (3) Issued as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?