CREOSOTE COUNCIL et al v. JOHNSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00512-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CREOSOTE COUNCIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER & HECKMAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas James Behr +1 202 434 4213 +1 202 434 4646 behr@khlaw.com
Space Jean-Cyril Walker +1 202 434 4200 walker@khlaw.com
No Logo Koppers Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER & HECKMAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas James Behr +1 202 434 4213 +1 202 434 4646 behr@khlaw.com
Space Jean-Cyril Walker +1 202 434 4200 walker@khlaw.com
No Logo SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER & HECKMAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas James Behr +1 202 434 4213 +1 202 434 4646 behr@khlaw.com
Space Jean-Cyril Walker +1 202 434 4200 walker@khlaw.com
No Logo TREATED WOOD COUNCIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER & HECKMAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas James Behr +1 202 434 4213 +1 202 434 4646 behr@khlaw.com
Space Jean-Cyril Walker +1 202 434 4200 walker@khlaw.com
No Logo WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLER & HECKMAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas James Behr +1 202 434 4213 +1 202 434 4646 behr@khlaw.com
Space Jean-Cyril Walker +1 202 434 4200 walker@khlaw.com
v.
No Logo STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/25/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STAYED, TYPE-D
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
MINUTE ORDER setting a status call on 1/27/09 at 3:00 p.m. and granting joint motion to stay [28] until 1/27/09. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 23, 2008. (MT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion to Stay
    Joint MOTION to Stay by CREOSOTE COUNCIL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Behr, Douglas)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
      MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time [27] to July 28, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on June 27,2008. (MT)
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008, Terminated: 6/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
          MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time [26] to June 26, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 28, 2008. (MT)
            LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              Case reassigned to the Calendar Committee. Judge James Robertson no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                ORDER granting motion for preliminary injunction [7]. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 15, 2008. (MT)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 15, 2008. (MT)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Motion Hearing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Robertson: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2008 re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TREATED WOOD COUNCIL, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, CREOSOTE COUNCIL. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (alr, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Supplemental Memorandum
                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [22] Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                            Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Purdy, Angeline)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Preliminary Injunction set for 4/21/2008 04:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. (alr, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion to continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction [20]. The hearing will be reset to April 21, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 3, 2008. (MT)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 ERRATA
                                    ERRATA Return of Service Affidavits by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL Summons Not Issued, [16] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [14] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by TREATED WOOD COUNCIL, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, CREOSOTE COUNCIL, [17] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [15] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC,. (Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Purdy on behalf of STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Purdy, Angeline)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. STEPHEN L. JOHNSON served on 3/26/2008, answer due 5/27/2008; UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/26/2008, answer due 5/27/2008 (Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General March 26, 2008. (Walker, Jean-Cyril)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE Certificate of Service by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL re [9] Order on Motion for Hearing (Behr, Douglas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jean-Cyril Walker on behalf of CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (nmw, ) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries [11] MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel for Plaintiffs and [10] MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel for Plaintiffs were entered in error as motions and counsel was instructed to refile said documents by using the correct event and including the appearing attorneys' signatures.(nmw, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel for Plaintiffs by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (Behr, Douglas) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel for Plaintiffs by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (Behr, Douglas) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nmw, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for an expedited hearing of their motion for preliminary injuction [8]. A hearing is set for 4:00 p.m., April 14, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 26, 2008. (MT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 3/26/2008 Motion for Hearing
                                                            MOTION for an Expedited Oral Hearing on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (tg, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008, Terminated: 5/15/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - 3, # (2) Exhibit 4 - 6, # (3) Exhibit 7 - 9)(tg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE (tg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TREATED WOOD COUNCIL (tg, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION (tg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                      LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KOPPERS INC. identifying Corporate Parent KOPPERS HOLDING, INC. for KOPPERS INC.. (tg, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CREOSOTE COUNCIL (tg, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT against STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011233) filed by CREOSOTE COUNCIL, KOPPERS INC., SOUTHERN PRESSURE TREATERS' ASSOCIATION, WESTERN WOOD PRESERVERS INSTITUTE, TREATED WOOD COUNCIL. (Attachments: # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) Modified to correct text on 3/26/2008 (tg, ).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS Not Issued as to STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (ks, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?