FORD v. WINTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00507-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD T. FORD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CASHDAN & KANE, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Robert Cashdan +1 202 862 4353 +1 202 862 4331 dcashdan@cashdankane.com
Space Michael Gerard Kane +1 202 862 4329 +1 202 862 4331 mkane@cashdankane.com
v.
No Logo DONALD C. WINTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/24/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Robertson: Status Conference held on 9/4/2008. Plaintiff's request for 60-day extension to complete discovery; granted. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2008 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2008 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (cp, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
    Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/4/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. (cp, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and reset court dates by RICHARD T. FORD (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cashdan, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: a final pretrial conference is set for September 18, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. and a jury trial will commence on October 1, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. All matters will be held in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 3, 2008. (MT)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Cashdan, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by David Robert Cashdan on behalf of RICHARD T. FORD (Cashdan, David)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Notice of QC
              NOTICE re [5] Meet and Confer Statement; emailed to dcashdan@cashdankane.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Attorney, David Cashdan, is not an attorney of record in this case. (tg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Cashdan, David) Modified on 6/30/2008 (tg, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                  Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2008 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge James Robertson. (zcp, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Answer
                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint by DONALD C. WINTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by RICHARD T. FORD.(Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 04/09/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DONALD C. WINTER served on 4/9/2008, answer due 6/12/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. DONALD C. WINTER served on 4/9/2008, answer due 6/12/2008 (Cashdan, David) Modified on 4/22/2008 (nmw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2008: # (1) Main Document) (nmw, ). Modified on 4/23/2008 (nmw, ). Modified on 6/18/2008 (nmw, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against DONALD C. WINTER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011191) filed by RICHARD T. FORD. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Summons Issued
                            Summons (3) Issued as to DONALD C. WINTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 71 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?