OU et al v. CHERTOFF et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00463-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HUIMIN YANG, Plaintiff
No Logo SHIWANG YANG, Plaintiff
No Logo YUZHEN OU, Plaintiff
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/18/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 99999
Terminated 8/18/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by YUZHEN OU, SHIWANG YANG, HUIMIN YANG, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, CONDOLEEZZA RICE. (Meriweather, Robin)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by YUZHEN OU, SHIWANG YANG, HUIMIN YANG (nmw, ) Modified on 8/6/2008 (nmw, ).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry [4] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was entered in error. Counsel is not a member of our bar and has not yet filed an appearance in the case. (nmw, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of MICHAEL CHERTOFF, CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Meriweather, Robin)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/8/2008. (lcrjl1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
            CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. Case Number C-07-3676 MMC filed by YUZHEN OU, SHIWANG YANG, HUIMIN YANG. (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Notice to Counsel, # (5) Exhibit Transcript) (jf, ).
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 79 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?