ROGLER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00570-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDAR Y. ROGLER, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo OWEN RAY FITZGERALD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/2/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
107-cv-02308-RMC
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-I
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by EDAR Y. ROGLER. (jf, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [24] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate [23] within ten days of the Court's order on Defendants' motion to dismiss [16] and motion for summary judgment [19]. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/27/08. (lcrmc2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [20] MOTION for Clarification of Court's Orders filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD. (Kidwell, Judith)
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Intent to File Written Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of Court's Orders by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion to Consolidate Cases
            MOTION to Consolidate by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment [16] no later than September 26, 2008. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/12/08. (lcrmc2)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's response to [16] due by 9/26/2008. (cdw)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number [16] to view document)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Filing Exhibits A through C Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss Or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D, # (2) Exhibit E, # (3) Exhibit F, # (4) Exhibit G)(Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order on Motion for Order
                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [15] Defendants' Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/11/08. (lcrmc2)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion for Order
                            Unopposed MOTION for Order To File Exhibits To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [14] Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings; denying as moot [13] Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings; and denying as moot [12] Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/5/08. (lcrmc2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008, Terminated: 8/5/2008 Motion to Withdraw
                                MOTION to Withdraw Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008, Terminated: 8/5/2008 Motion to Stay
                                  Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER denying [12] Plaintiff's Motion to Stay as moot in light of the Court's July 3, 2008 Minute Order. Pursuant to that Minute Order, Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than August 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/14/08. (lcrmc2)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Motion to Stay
                                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Response by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 8/11/2008. (cdw)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [11] consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than August 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/3/08. (KD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 7/8/2008. (cdw)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [9] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than July 8, 2008. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's [10] Consent Motion for Defendants' Enlargement of Time is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/26/08. (lcrmc2)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER denying [7] Plaintiff's Emergency Amended Motion for Relief from Contingency Agreement with Kator, Parks & Weiser, PLLC. No attorney from Kator, Parks & Weiser has entered an appearance in this matter. Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, that is, for herself, and without representation by a lawyer. Should Plaintiff obtain counsel, said counsel will file a notice of appearance. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/23/08. (lcrmc2)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008, Terminated: 6/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responses by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 6/24/2008. (cdw)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [8] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than June 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/19/08. (lcrmc2)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Emergency Amended MOTION for Relief from Contingency Engagement Agreement With Kator, Parks & Weiser, P.L.L.C. by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                Second Amended NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EDAR Y. ROGLER. Case related to Case Number 07-1676 Filed in the USDC for the District of Maryland. (tg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                  MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court of Maryland, and MOTION to Shorten Defendants' Time to Oppose or Sua Sponte Order to Transfer by EDAR Y. ROGLER (tg, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                    Amended NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EDAR Y. ROGLER. Case related to Case No. 07-2308. (tg, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OWEN RAY FITZGERALD served on 4/16/2008, answer due 5/6/2008 (tg, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                        Summons (1) Issued as to OWEN RAY FITZGERALD. (tg, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                          Summons (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EDAR Y. ROGLER. Case related to Case No. 07-2308. (tg, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, OWEN RAY FITZGERALD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011396) filed by EDAR Y. ROGLER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?