USA v. BEATTY
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00098-EGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark F. Daly +1 202 616 2245 +1 202 616 1786 mark.f.daly@usdoj.gov
Space Karen E. Kelly +1 202 616 3864 +1 202 616 1786 karen.e.kelly@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo LIZETTE BEATTY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Courtney Jahn +1 202 208 7500 +1 202 501 3829 dani_jahn@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/11/2008
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
107-mj-00577-JMF
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1); FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS; Filing False Individual Income Tax Return
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CAT A, PRIOR
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Notice of QC
NOTICE re [11] Notice (Other); emailed to dani_jahn@fd.org, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Modified to read as a Substitution of Counsel. Termed prev Atty and added new Atty.No need to refile (ztnr, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by LIZETTE BEATTY (Jahn, Danielle) Modified on 6/25/2008 (tnr, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order for Routine ProcessingCourt Filing
      ORDER FOR ROUTINE PROCESSING as to LIZETTE BEATTY signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/08. (tnr, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LIZETTE BEATTY (1) : Personal Recognizance signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/08. (tnr, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Factual Proffer
          FACTUAL BASIS by USA as to LIZETTE BEATTY. (tnr, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Plea Agreement
            PLEA AGREEMENT as to LIZETTE BEATTY. (tnr, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
              WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to LIZETTE BEATTY approved by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/08. (tnr, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by LIZETTE BEATTY signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/08. (tnr, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER as to LIZETTE BEATTY setting forth instruction to counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/08. (clv, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Arraignment
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan:Arraignment as to LIZETTE BEATTY (1) on Count 1 held on 4/30/2008, Plea of Guilty entered as to Count 1. REFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE for Presentence Investigation. Sentencing set for 10/7/2008 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Bond set as to LIZETTE BEATTY (1) : Personal Recognizance, Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant released; release issued. (Court Reporter: Wendy Ricard; Defense Attorney: Rita Bosworth; US Attorneys: Karen Kelly and Mark Daly) (tnr, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Set/Reset Hearings as to LIZETTE BEATTY: Sentencing set for 10/7/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (tnr, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Order
                        MINUTE ORDER as to LIZETTE BEATTY, Plea Agreement Hearing set for 4/30/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Defense counsel is to make arrangements for the defendant to be interviewed by Pretrial Service prior to the date of the plea. Notice sent to counsel of record, defendant and Pretial Service. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/15/08. (clv, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Information - Felony
                          INFORMATION as to LIZETTE BEATTY (1) on Count 1. (tnr, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rita Bosworth appearing for LIZZETTE BEATTY (Bosworth, Rita)[1:07-mj-00577-JMF]
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)Court Filing
                              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to LIZZETTE BEATTY. This document is unavailable due to E-Government Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/07/07. (as, )[1:07-mj-00577-JMF]
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?