POETT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00622-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 8:33 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH POETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joan Augusta Harvill +1 202 466 6346 +1 804 224 4038 Abogadaxyz@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tricia Dianne Francis +1 202 616 2257 +1 202 514 8780 tricia.Francis@usdoj.gov
Space Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/10/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
107-cv-01374-CKK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/5/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Plaintiff's 29 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's September 30, 2010 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs are OVERRULED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson's 28 Memorandum Opinion and Order is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/5/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tricia D. Francis on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Christian Natiello (Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        REPLY re 29 Response to Order 30 Response Reply to Def. Response to Pl Objections to Magistrate Judge's Sept. 30, 2010 Order filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Harvill, Joan) Modified links and event title on 11/15/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          RESPONSE re 29 To Plaintiff's Objections To The Magistrate Judge's September 30, 2010, Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Attorney's Fees And Costs filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Natiello, Christian) Modified to add link on 11/5/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/04/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 28 Memorandum & Opinion, Order September 30 2010 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/30/10 DENYING (Document No. 23) Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs of Suit. (EW) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Wynne Patrick Kelly on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1992 letter, # 2 Exhibit)(Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Memorandum in opposition to re 23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson 23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit by JOSEPH POETT. (kb) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                        First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs of Suit by JOSEPH POETT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: 1/18/2010 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2010. (lcckk2) (Entered: 01/18/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: 1/18/2010 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                            ORDER. Based on the reasoning set forth in an accompanying memorandum opinion, this case is DISMISSED subject to the filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Defendant's pending 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is therefore DENIED as MOOT. Finally, the Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is due on or before February 18, 2010; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is due on or before March 22, 2010; and Plaintiff's Reply, if any, is due on or before April 12, 2010. This is a final, appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2010. (lcckk2 ) (Entered: 01/18/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT Joint status report by JOSEPH POETT. (Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Status Report
                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT joint status report by JOSEPH POETT. (Harvill, Joan) Modified on 1/19/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Memorandum
                                  MEMORANDUM re 16 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JOSEPH POETT, 17 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE by JOSEPH POETT. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Exhibit 1-7 to Supplement to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion summary judgment, # 2 Supplement First pg of Exhibit 6 to Supplement to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion summary judgment)(Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of David M. Hardy)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Opposition to Def. motion sum jud filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 8 to Opposition defendant's motion summary judgment)(Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 9/8/2008. (dot, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                            MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting [9] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Vaughn Index. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including September 8, 2008, to file its Vaughn Index; the schedule for filing Motion for Summary Judgment shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 26, 2008. (SM)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Out of Time filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Vaughn Index by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Civil Statement
                                                  Civil Statement from Plaintiff Explanation. (Harvill, Joan) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2008. Defendant's Vaughn Index due by 8/25/2008. (dot, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) Modified on 9/26/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Order
                                                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court has reviewed the parties' proposed schedule for proceeding in this matter and orders as follows: (1) Defendant shall file a Vaughn index in this case no later than August 25, 2008; (2) dispositive motions shall be filed on or before September 23, 2008; (3) oppositions to dispositive motions shall be filed on or before October 23, 2008; and (4) replies shall be filed on or before November 12, 2008. The Court will consider whether any in camera review is necessary after briefing is complete. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 1, 2008. (lcckk2)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Out of Time by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: # 1 Exhibit Motion for Summary Judgment) (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Harvill, Joan)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Vaughn Index
                                                              Vaughn Index Notice of Filing. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit to Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER.The parties shall confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and should propose a schedule for the filing of dispositive motions. The parties shall file the schedule not later than July 25, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 9, 2008. (lcckk2)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Answer
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JOSEPH POETT.(Natiello, Christian)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on May 22, 2008. (SM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/23/2008. (dot, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting [4] unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, Defendants shall have until and including June 23, 2008, to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 20, 2008. (SM)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Notice of Related Case
                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOSEPH POETT. Case related to Case No. 07-CV-1374 CKK. (td, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011556) filed by JOSEPH POETT. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit)(td, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 571 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?