FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P. v. WEEMS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00643-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Robinson +1 202 662 4534 +1 202 662 4643 frobinson@fulbright.com
v.
No Logo Centers For Medicare And Medicaid Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo KERRY N. WEEMS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
STANDING ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on June 24, 2008. Read this order carefully, it will govern this case. Failure to follow this order will result in sanctions.(jwd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
    ANSWER to [7] Amended Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, KERRY N. WEEMS. Related document: [7] Amended Complaint filed by FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P..(Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's response is due on or before June 23, 2008. (jwd )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        MINUTE ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the defendant's motion for extention of time to answer or respond to amended complaint is granted. Defendant's response is due on or before June 23, 2008. Further motions filed by the defendant that do not abide by the court's standing order or seek extensions of time because of poor internal work-assignment management practices will not be seriously entertained. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 6/17/08. (lcrmu1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Amended Complaint
          AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES filed by FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P..(nmw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2008: # (1) Certificate of Service) (nmw, ).
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
            Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P.. (Robinson, Frederick)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 6/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by KERRY N. WEEMS (Natiello, Christian)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of KERRY N. WEEMS (Natiello, Christian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                  Case Reassigned to Judge Ricardo M. Urbina as related. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Notice of Related Case
                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P.. Case related to Case No. 1:07-cv-01298. (Robinson, Frederick)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against KERRY N. WEEMS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011670) filed by FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI, L.L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                        SUMMONS (3) Issued as to KERRY N. WEEMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 137 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?