JAMES MADISON PROJECT v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00708-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 11:31 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES MADISON PROJECT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MARK S. ZAID, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley P. Moss +1 202 907 7945 +1 202 330 5610 brad@markzaid.com
Space Mark Steven Zaid +1 202 454 2809 +1 202 330 5610 Mark@MarkZaid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Steven Zaid +1 202 454 2809 +1 202 330 5610 Mark@MarkZaid.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment, [7] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration A, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Kidwell, Judith)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
    MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time [10] to August 26, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 21, 2008. (MT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Moss Rule 56(f) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 2 - NYT Article on Changes at CIA, # (3) Exhibit 3 - WAPO Article on Changes to OIG, # (4) Exhibit 4 - POGO post, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Semiannual IG Report, # (6) Exhibit 6 - NYT Article Hayden Defends Review, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Helgerson Briefing, # (8) Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
            MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for extension of time [8] to August 11, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 18, 2008. (MT)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (See Docket Entry [5] to view document). (nmw, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Zaid on behalf of JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Zaid, Mark)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Delores M. Nelson, # (2) Exhibit A1, # (3) Exhibit A2, # (4) Exhibit B-D)(Kidwell, Judith)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                    MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time [4] to July 14, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on June 11, 2008. (MT)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kidwell, Judith)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011865) filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Summons Issued
                              Summons (3) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?