KLOECKNER v. CHAO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00762-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 27, 2016 at 7:32 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF LARRY J STEIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry J. Stein +1 703 599 8023 +1 703 424 7670 larrystein@ljslaw.net
v.
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "ELAINE L. CHAO"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/1/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of extraction re Case transferred out to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri, pursuant to Court Order entered 05/15/09. Sent to Court electronically (jf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Defendant's Motion 9 to Transfer For Improper Venue. ORDERED that the above-captioned case be transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/15/09. (kc) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION for Order for oral argument by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
        REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELAINE L. CHAO. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
          Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agency Motion to Dismiss MSPB Appeal, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Stein, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines defendant answer due to Complaint by 9/29/2008, (kc)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2008, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 10/26/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ELAINE L. CHAO (Natiello, Christian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of ELAINE L. CHAO (Natiello, Christian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Dismiss by ELAINE L. CHAO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-A, # 2 Exhibit 1-B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                        MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ELAINE L. CHAO. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant has up to and including 9/29/2008 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/2008. (lcrjl2)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Stein, Larry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Stein, Larry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/01/2008. (Stein, Larry)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/30/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ELAINE L. CHAO served on 6/30/2008, answer due 8/29/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 6/30/2008, answer due 8/29/2008 (td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued (3)as to ELAINE L. CHAO, USA, AND USAG. (mmh, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/16/2008. (lcrjl2)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against ELAINE L. CHAO ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012085) filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Summons Not Issued
                                        SUMMONS Not Issued as to ELAINE L. CHAO (jf, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?