USA v. SAANI
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00147-RJL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2019 at 3:42 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn H. Albrecht +1 202 514 1412 kate.albrecht@usdoj.gov
Space Emily W. Allen +1 202 307 0946 emily.allen@usdoj.gov
Space Ann C. Brickley +1 202 514 7532 ann.brickley@usdoj.gov
Space Ryan J. Danks +1 202 305 0128 +1 202 307 5802 ryan.danks@usdoj.gov
Space Richard B. Evans +1 202 353 7760 +1 202 305 7643 richard.b.evans@usdoj.gov
Space Mark Pletcher +1 202 307 6186 mark.pletcher@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo TIJANI AHMED SAANI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Lubitz +1 202 547 1110 david.lubitz@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joanne Roney Hepworth +1 202 789 0037 +1 301 320 3948 jrhepworth@erols.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Patricia A. Pileggi,LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A. Pileggi +1 212 425 3391 +1 212 425 3394 ppileggi@paplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan Kellman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Gail Kellman +1 718 783 8200 +1 718 783 8226 kellmanesq@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/16/2008
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
108-mj-00203-JMF
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1); FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS; Filing a False Income Tax Return.
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags APPEAL, CAT B
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Supplement to any document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Travel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Travel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Appear
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Status Conference set for 1/9/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting Government's Motion [31] to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/08. (kc) (kc, ). Modified on 9/3/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING declaration of Special Agent Troy Burrus by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [31] MOTION to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations and to Set a Trial Date. (Attachment: # (1) Declaration)(mlp) 49 Filed: 09/02/2008Entered: 09/03/2008 Order on Motion to Exclude ORDER granting Government's Motion [31] to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/28/08. (kc) (kc, ). Modified on 9/3/2008 (hsj, ). -- Filed & Entered: 09/03/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Status Conference set for 1/9/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Notice of QC
                                                            NOTICE re [45] Transcript; emailed to ann.brickley@usdoj.gov, david.lubitz@verizon.net, emily.all, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document filed in wrong case. Please disregard Doc. [46]. This document filed correctly. (hsj, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Notice of QC
                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE re [46] Order; emailed to linda_pugh@dcd.uscourts.gov,ann.brickley@usdoj.gov, david.l, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document filed in wrong case. (hsj, ) Modified on 8/19/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI striking entry of appearance of Nathan I. Silver, Esq. at request of counsel. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/15/08. (mlp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 8/12/08; Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/8/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008.(Gels, Patty) Modified on 8/19/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Notice of QC
                                                                    NOTICE re [44] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; emailed to nisquire@aol.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document should be filed as a motion with order attached to motion. (hsj, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008, Terminated: 8/13/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to Strike Attorney Appearance) by Nathan I. Silver. by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, Nathan) Modified on 8/13/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Reply in Support
                                                                        REPLY in Support by TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [40] MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue (Lubitz, David)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Status Conference
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI held on 8/12/2008. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed;Commitment Issued. (Present: Defense Attorney: Susan Kellman;David Lubitz. US Attorney: Ryan Danks; Ann C. Brickley; Richard Evans.) Court Reporter: Patty Gels. (kc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [40] MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue (Brickley, Ann)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lubitz, David)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 USCA Case Number
                                                                                USCA Case Number as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI: 08-3055, for [29] Notice of Appeal filed by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (mlp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 7/15/08; Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008.(Gels, Patty)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 7/3/08; Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/5/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2008.(Gels, Patty)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion Hearing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Motion Hearing as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI held on 7/15/2008. MOTION [31] to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations by USA, taken under advisement. Status Conference set for 8/12/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant committed; Commitment issued; (Present: Defense Attorney: Susan Kellman; US Attorney: Ann Brickley; Richard Evans; Ryan Danks; Court Reporter: Patty Gels.) (kc, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2008 AT 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [37] Motion to Continue as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1) (kc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing on Government Motion To Exclude Speedy Trial Time by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lubitz, David)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [31] MOTION to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations, and to Set a Trial Date (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Government Motion To Exclude Speedy Trial Time by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lubitz, David)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI held on 7/3/2008. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed: Commitment Issued. (Present: Defense Attorney: Susan Kellman, David Lubitz. US Attorney: Richard Evans, Emily Allen.) (Court Reporter: Patty Gels.) (kc)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard B. Evans appearing for USA. (Evans, Richard)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [31] MOTION to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations, and to Set a Trial Date (Lubitz, David)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI before Judge Richard J. Leon of proceedings held on 6/20/08; Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/22/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2008.(Gels, Patty)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Status Conference set for 7/3/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Act calculations, and to Set a Trial Date by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration by Special Agent Troy Burrus, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Danks, Ryan)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR......NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by TIJANI AHMED SAANI re Denying of defendant's Motion to Review Bond Status during the Arraignment on 6/23/08. Appeal reference TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statmemnt not received. Filing fee $ 455. (hsj, ) Modified on 6/24/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI to US Court of Appeals re [29] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (hsj, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Notice of QC
                                                                                                                  NOTICE re [29] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment; emailed to david.lubitz@verizon.net, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document [29} was modified, and counsel is instructed not to refile said document (hsj, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by TIJANI AHMED SAANI re Denying of defendant's Motion to Review Bond Status during the Arraignment on 6/23/08. Appeal reference TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statmemnt not received. receipt number 00900000000001536968. Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lubitz, David) Modified on 6/24/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David M. Lubitz appearing for TIJANI AHMED SAANI (Lubitz, David)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Arraignment
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Arraignment as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1) Count 1 held on 6/20/2008. Plea not guilty entered by TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1) on counts 1. Motion to review bond status [24], heard and denied. Status Conference set for 7/1/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/Commitment Issued) (Court Reporter: Patty Gels) (Defense Attorney: Patricia A. Pileggi, Susan Kellman; US Attorney: Kathryn Albrecht, Ann Brickley) (hsj, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [24] MOTION to Review Bond Status (Brickley, Ann)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [22] Motion for Protective Order as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/18/08. (lin, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion to Review
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Review Bond Status by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Review Bond)(Pileggi, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                Set/ResetHearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI: Arraignment set for 6/20/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 06/16/08 as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (ldc, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 6/19/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Albrecht, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Status Conference as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI held on 6/16/2008. Matter Stricken from the calendar. Arraignment is set before Judge Leon. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant committed; commitment issued; Court Reporter: Pro Typist Defense Attorney: Dani Jahn Standing in only; US Attorney: Catherine Connelly; Pretrial Officer: Michael Lukenich; (ldc, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Arrest
                                                                                                                                        Arrest of TIJANI AHMED SAANI (ldc, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Rule 40 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                          Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received-(Formerly Rule 40 Documents Received) as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI from USDC for the Eastern District of New York, In New York City Case Number 08-203M-01. (hsj, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI: Arraignment originally set for 6/12/08 was reset for 7/1/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Supplement to any document
                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Bail Release Pending Trial by TIJANI AHMED SAANI (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Transcript of Bail Hearing, # (2) Exhibit B-Title and Deed, # (3) Exhibit B-Continued Appraisal, # (4) Exhibit C-Gas Bill, # (5) Exhibit D-Payments of Flossmoor property, # (6) Exhibit E-Medical Records, # (7) Exhibit F-Library Card, # (8) Exhibit G-Travel Orders Shipment of Furniture)(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER ;granting [17] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attorney Patricia A. Pileggi,Esq. as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI and granting [18] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,Attorney Susan G. Kellman, Esq. as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI, Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/2/08. (hs)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Attorney Patricia A. Pileggi, and Susan G. Kellman for TIJANI AHMED SAANI added. (ks, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                    Set Hearings as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI: Arraignment set for 6/12/2008 @ 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM and ORDER as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI, Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/2/08. (hs)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/3/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hoc Vice
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan Gail Kellman. :Address- 25 8th Avenue, Brooklyn, New York 11217. Phone No. - 718-783-8200. by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Susan G. Kellman)(Lauro, John)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/3/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hoc Vice
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patricia Anne Pileggi. :Address- 747 Third Avenue - 32nd Floor, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - 212-425-3391. Fax No. - 347-287-6860 by TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Patricia A. Pileggi)(Lauro, John)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to Defendant's [14] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [6] MOTION to Stay and for Revocation of Release Order as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (tnr)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for 404(b) Evidence
                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Bond Review/Revocation of Release Order by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhbit A, # (2) Errata Exhibit B)(Albrecht, Kathryn) Modified on 5/30/2008 (tnr, ).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document [16] as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. Document need to be filed as a Notice of Filing with Exhibits A and B attached. (hsj, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: (13) MOTION was entered in error and terminated as incorrect event used. The document has been refiled as a REPLY. The attachments have been omitted and Counsel has been instructed to refile the attachments with a Notice of Filing once identifiers have been redacted as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (tnr, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Response to DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in opposition by TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [6] MOTION to stay and for revocation of release order; (Attachments: # (1) Home Loan Statement) "Let this be filed by Chief Judge Lamberth"(erd)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER to VACATE the arraignment/status hearing as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI set for 5/28/08. (mpt, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI Arraignment set for 5/28/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ann C. Brickley appearing for USA. (Brickley, Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kathryn H. Albrecht appearing for USA. (Albrecht, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Ryan J. Danks appearing for USA. Also Mark W. Pletcher and Emily W. Allen (Danks, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kathryn H. Albrecht appearing for USA. (Albrecht, Kathryn)[1:08-mj-00203-JMF] Modified on 5/20/2008 (hsj, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. Attorney Mark Pletcher for USA, Emily W. Allen for USA added. (mlp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document [8] as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI was entered in error(in the wrong case) and counsel was instructed not to refile said pleading. Document was refiled as #[11]. (hsj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1) count(s) 1. (hsj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth:Telephone Conference as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI held on 5/16/2008. Bond Status of Defendant: committed (presence waived); Court Reporter: Theresa Sorensen (Defense Attorney: Peter Toumbekis (via tel-conference; US Attorney: Ann C. Brickley, Ryan J. Danks); (rje)[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to stay release order as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI re [6] MOTION to stay and for revocation of release order filed by USA; Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/15/08. (erd)[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Co
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to stay and for revocation of release order OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION for the USDC for the Eastern District of New York to District Court by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI; (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support)(erd)[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [4] Motion to Unseal Case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/08/08. (zas, )[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (zas, )[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Order on Motion to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal Case as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 3/25/08. (ztnr, )[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(ztnr, )[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Complaint(Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED COMPLAINT as to TIJANI AHMED SAANI (1). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of a Criminal Complaint) (ztnr, )[1:08-mj-00203-JMF]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 219 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?