MILL v. WYNNE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00892-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT J. MILL, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Richard S. Matesic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Bamberger +1 703 551 4979 +1 703 499 9809 sbamberger@verizon.net
v.
No Logo MICHAEL J. WYNNE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/27/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-B
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
MOTION to Transfer Case by MICHAEL J. WYNNE. (See Docket Entry [6] to view document) (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL J. WYNNE (Owens, Cindy) Modified on 8/1/2008 (jf, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL J. WYNNE served on 6/2/2008, answer due 8/1/2008. (Bamberger, Stephen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice of QC
        NOTICE re [4] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to s.a.bamberger@verizon.net, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document not complete/legible, 2. Please refile document (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL J. WYNNE served on 6/25/2008, answer due 8/24/2008. (Bamberger, Stephen) Modified on 7/8/2008 (jf, ).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice of QC
            NOTICE re [3] Proof of Service for In Rem Defendant; emailed to s.a.bamberger@verizon.net, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document title does not match docketed event, 2. Please refile document, 3. Incorrect entry used; please refile as Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant (nmw, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Proof of Service for In Rem Defendant
              ENTERED IN ERROR.....PROOF OF SERVICE UPON IN REM DEFENDANT filed by ROBERT J. MILL, JR. (Bamberger, Stephen) Modified on 7/3/2008 (nmw, ).
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of MICHAEL J. WYNNE (Owens, Cindy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against MICHAEL J. WYNNE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012575) filed by ROBERT J. MILL, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL J. WYNNE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 101 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?