WILSON v. HAYDEN
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00909-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEN KENYATTA WILSON, Plaintiff
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/29/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $99999000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of MICHAEL HAYDEN (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 7/18/2008. (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008 (tg, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Summons Issued
        Summons (3) Issued as to MICHAEL HAYDEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Plaintiff is not required to pay an initial partial filing fee. The Plaintiff is obligated to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for twenty percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account as continued partial payments on the remaining balance of the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/28/2008. (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
            PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by KEN KENYATTA WILSON (tg, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KEN KENYATTA WILSON (tg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against MICHAEL HAYDEN filed by KEN KENYATTA WILSON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Summons Not Issued
                  SUMMONS Not Issued as to MICHAEL HAYDEN (tg, )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 117 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?