WILLIAMS-JONES v. PETERS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00884-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Mary E Peters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo RAY LAHOOD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/23/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $700000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT (Joint Proposed Schedule) by RAY LAHOOD, MARY E. PETERS. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Keller Canizares on behalf of SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES (Canizares, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MARY E. PETERS. Attorney Wynne Patrick Kelly terminated. (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Wynne Patrick Kelly on behalf of MARY E. PETERS (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MARY E. PETERS (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/22/2009. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/10/09. (SP, ) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for settlement discussions. A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 11/23/2009 at 2:00 P.M. in Chambers before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (kb) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                    REQUEST for entry of default. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STANDING ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 10/5/2009. Read this Standing Order carefully, it will govern this case. Failure to follow the Standing Order will result in sanctions.(tg, ) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by MARY E. PETERS. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES.(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 09/18/2009. (lcrmu1) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER denying 7 the defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 09/18/2009. (lcrmu1) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARY E. PETERS. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Default Judgment by SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES (jf, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in opposition to 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Errata 13)(tg, ) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by MARY E. PETERS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - 4)(Natiello, Christian)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARY E. PETERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exibits to Motion to Dismiss)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 09/02/2008.(jwd)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's [6] motion to enlarge time to file answer or otherwise respond to complaint, and no opposition having been filed by the plaintiff, the defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 09/02/2008. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 08/11/2008. (lcrmu1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by MARY E. PETERS (Natiello, Christian)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of MARY E. PETERS Substituting for attorney Ray Martinez (Natiello, Christian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/2/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 5/30/2008, answer due 7/29/2008 (jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MARY E. PETERS served on 6/2/2008, answer due 8/1/2008. (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of MARY E. PETERS (Martinez, Raymond)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against MARY E. PETERS ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012570) filed by SHIRLEY WILLIAMS-JONES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                          SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MARY E. PETERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?