AHMAD v. BUSH
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00952-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:22 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ABDUL BAQI, Petitioner

Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu
No Logo JAWED AHMAD, Petitioner

Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu
v.
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe #2, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ROBERT GATES, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/4/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-G
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 (Lin, Jean)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT GATES served on 6/6/2008, answer due 8/5/2008. (nmw, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/6/2008. (nmw, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Kelly on behalf of JAWED AHMAD, ABDUL BAQI (ks, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616012781.) filed by JAWED AHMAD, ABDUL BAQI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Summons Not Issued
            SUMMONS Not Issued. (td, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 140 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?