NEWBY v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00983-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BETTY ANN NEWBY, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ALBERT GONZALES, Defendant
No Logo ALFONSO JACKSON, Defendant
No Logo All Defendants, Defendant
No Logo ARLEN SPECTER, Defendant
No Logo BRETT KAVANAUGH, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES BURTON, Defendant
No Logo DAVID ADDINGTON, Defendant
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE"
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"
No Logo Department Of Housing And Urban Development, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR"
No Logo DICK CHENEY, Defendant
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS"
No Logo FRED FIELDING, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE H. BUSH, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"
No Logo HARRIET MIERS, Defendant
No Logo HENRY HAGER, Defendant
No Logo HENRY KISSINGER, Defendant
No Logo JACK POTTER, Defendant
No Logo JENNA BUSH HAGER, Defendant
No Logo JOHN ASHCROFT, Defendant
No Logo John McConnell, Defendant
No Logo JOHN NEGROPONTE, Defendant
No Logo John Roberts, Defendant
No Logo JOHN WARNER, Defendant
No Logo KARL ROVE, Defendant
No Logo KEITH ALEXANDER, Defendant
No Logo LOCKE LORD BISSELLE & LIDDELL, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo MICHAEL MUKASEY, Defendant
No Logo Minton, Burton, Foster & Collins, PC, Defendant
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY"
No Logo PAT ROBERTS, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK LEAHY, Defendant
No Logo PAUL WOLFOWITZ, Defendant
No Logo PHILLIP PERRY, Defendant
No Logo POLITICAL NOMINEES OF PRESIDENT GEORGE W. BUSH, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT GATES, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT MUELLER, Defendant
No Logo SAMUEL ALITO, JR., Defendant
No Logo SENATE ARMED SERVICES COMMITTEE, Defendant
No Logo Ranking Member, Defendant
Officially listed as "SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE"
No Logo SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE, Defendant
No Logo TOM RIDGE, Defendant
No Logo United States Marshal Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE"
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
No Logo US PROTECT, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/6/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 11001
Terminated 8/14/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TYPE-L
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Upon consideration of [5] Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the Case Voluntarily and without Prejudice or Non-Suit the Case without Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's [2] Order, filed on June 17, 2008 and the Court's Minute Entry Order filed on July 23, 2008 are VACATED; and it is further ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is further ORDERED that [4] Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended Complaint is DENIED as moot; and Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal without Prejudice and Reinstate Original Complaint to take Statutory Steps to Convene a Three-Judge Panel is DENIED as moot. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 08/14/08. (lcrmc1)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    MOTION to Dismiss The Case Voluntarily and Without Prejudice or Non-Suit the Case Without Prejudice by BETTY ANN NEWBY (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by BETTY ANN NEWBY (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by R. M. Collyer.
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 8/8/2008. (cdw)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint no later than August 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/23/08. (lcrmc1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by BETTY ANN NEWBY (tg, ) "Leave to file granted" by Judge R. M. Collyer.
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER dismissing [1] Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 41. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than July 18, 2008, that corrects the deficiencies addressed in the attached Order or risk dismissal of the Complaint with prejudice. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/17/08. (lcrmc1)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 7/18/2008. (cdw)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against HARRIET MIERS, JOHN ASHCROFT, FRED FIELDING, PAUL WOLFOWITZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN ROBERTS, SAMUEL ALITO, JR., BRETT KAVANAUGH, ROBERT GATES, MICHAEL HAYDEN, MICHAEL MUKASEY, POLITICAL NOMINEES OF PRESIDENT GEORGE W. BUSH, SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, ARLEN SPECTER, JOHN WARNER, PATRICK LEAHY, PAT ROBERTS, SENATE ARMED SERVICES COMMITTEE, SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, GEORGE W. BUSH, US PROTECT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, ALFONSO JACKSON, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, KEITH ALEXANDER, GEORGE H. BUSH, JACK POTTER, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, ROBERT MUELLER, TOM RIDGE, HENRY KISSINGER, JOHN MCCONNELL, JOHN NEGROPONTE, PHILLIP PERRY, CHARLES BURTON, JENNA BUSH HAGER, MINTON, BURTON, FOSTER & COLLINS, P.C., LOCKE LORD BISSELLE & LIDDELL, LLP, ALL DEFENDANTS, HENRY HAGER, KARL ROVE, ALBERT GONZALES, DICK CHENEY, DAVID ADDINGTON ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012866) filed by BETTY ANN NEWBY. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) Modified to correct party on 6/9/2008 (tg, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Summons Not Issued
                    SUMMONS Not Issued as to HARRIET MIERS, JOHN ASHCROFT, FRED FIELDING, PAUL WOLFOWITZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN ROBERTS, SAMUEL ALITO, JR., BRETT KAVANAUGH, ROBERT GATES, MICHAEL HAYDEN, BETTY ANN NEWBY, MICHAEL MUKASEY, POLITICAL NOMINEES OF PRESIDENT GEORGE W. BUSH, SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE, ARLEN SPECTER, JOHN WARNER, PATRICK LEAHY, PAT ROBERTS, SENATE ARMED SERVICES COMMITTEE, SENATE SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, GEORGE W. BUSH, US PROTECT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, ALFONSO JACKSON, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, KEITH ALEXANDER, GEORGE H. BUSH, JACK POTTER, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, ROBERT MUELLER, TOM RIDGE, HENRY KISSINGER, JOHN MCCONNELL, JOHN NEGROPONTE, PHILLIP PERRY, CHARLES BURTON, JENNA BUSH HAGER, MINTON, BURTON, FOSTER & COLLINS, P.C., LOCKE LORD BISSELLE & LIDDELL, LLP, HENRY HAGER, KARL ROVE, ALBERT GONZALES, DICK CHENEY, DAVID ADDINGTON, ALL DEFENDANTS. (tg, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 195 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?