HYSON v. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00979-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ALFREDA HYSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
No Logo ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/6/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $450000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 10, 2011. (lchhk3) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Green Card)(Rucker, Donna)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL served on 7/14/2008, answer due 9/12/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Green Card)(Rucker, Donna)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012849) filed by ALFREDA HYSON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit)(jf, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
          SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 70 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?