United States v. DAVIS
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00169-EGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:50 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela Gudrun Schmidt +1 202 514 7273 +1 202 353 9414 angela.schmidt@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo PHILLIP DAVIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Courtney Jahn +1 202 208 7500 +1 202 501 3829 dani_jahn@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/12/2008
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) and (f); BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE; Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CAT A
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to PHILLIP DAVIS: Sentencing set for 11/4/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER as to PHILLIP DAVIS; sentence is scheduled for 11/4/98 at 1:00; setting forth further instruction to counsel and the probation office. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/25/08. (clv, ) (clv, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
      WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to PHILLIP DAVIS approved by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/24/08. (tnr, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by PHILLIP DAVIS signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/24/08. (tnr, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement
          STATEMENT OF THE OFFENSE by USA as to PHILLIP DAVIS. (tnr, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Plea Agreement
            PLEA AGREEMENT as to PHILLIP DAVIS. (tnr, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Arraignment
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan:Arraignment as to PHILLIP DAVIS (1) on Count 1 held on 7/24/2008, Plea of Guilty entered as to Count 1. REFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE for Presentence Investigation. Sentencing set for 11/4/2008 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Bond set as to PHILLIP DAVIS (1) : held without bond.Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant committed; commitment issued. (Court Reporter: Jackie Sullivan;Defense Attorney: Danielle Jahn; US Attorney: Angela Schmidt) (tnr, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Receipt for Transfer Papers
                Receipt on 6/12/08 of certified docket sheet as to PHILLIP DAVIS. Other Court Number 8:08-cr-00283-RWT-1 sent by U.S.D.C. for the District of Maryland, Greenbelt. (tnr, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Letter
                  CONSENT TO TRANSFER CASE for Plea and Sentence (Rule 20) from U.S.D.C. for the District of Maryland, Greenbelt signed by Defendant, Defense Counsel and the U.S. Attorneys for the District of Maryland and the District of Columbia as to PHILLIP DAVIS. (tnr, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Rule 20 Transfer Notice
                    RULE 20 Transfer Notice by USA as to PHILLIP DAVIS from U.S.D.C. for the District of Maryland, Greenbelt. Case Number: 08-CR-0283 RWT. Certified copies of docket sheet and Information received. (tnr, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Information - Felony
                      INFORMATION as to PHILLIP DAVIS (1) on Count 1. (tnr, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 121 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?