HAQ v. BASHAM
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01023-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ZIA UL HAQ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by elliotlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Elliot +1 202 429 1725 +1 202 452 0161 tom@elliotlaw.com
v.
No Logo JONATHAN SCHARFEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
United States Customs & Border Protection United States Customs & Border Protection, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo W. RALPH BASHAM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/16/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 8/13/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by W. RALPH BASHAM, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, JONATHAN SCHARFEN, MICHAEL CHERTOFF. (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 6/30/2008, answer due 8/29/2008. (Elliot, Thomas)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to W. RALPH BASHAM served on 6/26/2008, answer due 8/25/2008. (Elliot, Thomas)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF served on 6/25/2008, answer due 8/24/2008. (Elliot, Thomas)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JONATHAN SCHARFEN served on 6/19/2008, answer due 8/18/2008. (Elliot, Thomas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 06/19/2008. (Elliot, Thomas)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. W. RALPH BASHAM served on 6/19/2008, answer due 8/18/2008 (Elliot, Thomas)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against W. RALPH BASHAM, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, JONATHAN SCHARFEN, MICHAEL CHERTOFF ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013041) filed by ZIA UL HAQ. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tr )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                  SUMMONS Issued (6) as to W. RALPH BASHAM, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, JONATHAN SCHARFEN, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 91 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?