BOLDEN v. RICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01012-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES H. BOLDEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Wayne Beasley +1 703 533 5875 +1 703 533 5876 beasleys2@verizon.net
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Blake Harwood +1 202 307 0372 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.harwood@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/13/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 56 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 3/9/2012. (lcrmu2)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before 09/19/2008. (jwd )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
      MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's [3] consent motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint, and good cause having been shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before 09/19/2008. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 08/15/2008. (lcrmu1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Harwood, Christopher)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of CONDOLEEZZA RICE (Harwood, Christopher)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013010) filed by CHARLES H. BOLDEN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
              SUMMONS (3) Issued as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?