LIBERTAD v. WINTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01040-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIOSDADO GRUSPE LIBERTAD, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DONALD C. WINTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/18/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that plaintiff shall file his opposition or other response to defendant's motion to dismiss not later than October 31, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 27, 2008. (MT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DONALD C. WINTER served on 6/26/2008, answer due 8/25/2008. (tg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 6/25/2008, answer due 8/24/2008 (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008, Terminated: 6/18/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DIOSDADO GRUSPE LIBERTAD (tg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against DONALD C. WINTER filed by DIOSDADO GRUSPE LIBERTAD. (Attachments: # (1) Attachments, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Summons Issued
                Summons (3) Issued as to DONALD C. WINTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                  FIAT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "The application is hereby granted. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security thereof." Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 6/16/2008. (tg, )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 76 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?