NEUMAN v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01068-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES NEUMAN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo All Defendants, Defendant
No Logo American Association Of University Women, Defendant
No Logo ANDREW M. STRONGJY, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
No Logo CHRISTINE STONEMAN, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo CYBELE DALEY, Defendant
No Logo EARL SONDARS, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH KEENAN, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FBI"
No Logo FEDERAL EEO AND CIVIL RIGHTS EXECUTIVES, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"
No Logo GLENN A. FINE, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo JIM MORROW, Defendant
No Logo JOHN ASHCROFT, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo JOHN E. POTTER, Defendant
No Logo JOHN L. CHASTAIN, Defendant
No Logo LUZ LOPEZ-ORTIZ, Defendant
No Logo MARK KAPPELHOFF, Defendant
No Logo MASSACHUSETTS NOTARY PUBLIC AND LEGAL SERVICES, Defendant
No Logo MERRILY FREIDLANDER, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL MUKASEY, Defendant
No Logo NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF JUSTICE, Defendant
No Logo OFFICE OF INSTITUTIONAL EQUITY, TULANE UNIVERSITY, Defendant
No Logo PATRICK WASHINGTON, Defendant
No Logo PAUL CLEMENT, Defendant
No Logo POSTMASTER GENERAL, Defendant
No Logo RACHAEL HORMANN, Defendant
No Logo RITA CRAIG, Defendant
No Logo RODNEY GRADEN, Defendant
No Logo SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, TULANE, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT COWEN, Defendant
No Logo SCOTT J. BLOCH, Defendant
No Logo SHANETTA Y. CUTLAR, Defendant
No Logo State of South Carolina, Defendant
No Logo TAMMIE GREGG, Defendant
No Logo TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Defendant
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Defendant
Officially listed as "TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE"
No Logo TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Defendant
No Logo TRISTAN MARTIN, Defendant
No Logo Tulane University, Defendant
No Logo TULANE UNIVERSITY STUDENT AFFAIRS, Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT"
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
No Logo WASHINGTON STATE HUMAN RIGHTS COMMISSION, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/20/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-L
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Waiver of Service
WAIVER OF SERVICE by JAMES NEUMAN. TULANE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008; TULANE UNIVERSITY STUDENT AFFAIRS waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008; SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, TULANE waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008; OFFICE OF INSTITUTIONAL EQUITY, TULANE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008; RACHAEL HORMANN waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008; SCOTT COWEN waiver sent on 7/30/2008, answer due 9/29/2008. (nmw, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    ORDER granting plaintiff's motion to change address to P.O. Box address [2]. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 21, 2008. (MT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
      MOTION for Change of Address, P.O. Box Address. by JAMES NEUMAN (tg, ) "Leave to file granted" by Judge James Robertson.
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF JUSTICE, BUREAU JUSTICE STATISTICS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, GEORGE W. BUSH, ALBERTO GONZALES, JOHN ASHCROFT, SCOTT J. BLOCH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL MUKASEY, CYBELE DALEY, PAUL CLEMENT, GLENN A. FINE, JOHN L. CHASTAIN, MERRILY FREIDLANDER, ELIZABETH KEENAN, RITA CRAIG, PATRICK WASHINGTON, TRISTAN MARTIN, LUZ LOPEZ-ORTIZ, ANDREW M. STRONGJY, CHRISTINE STONEMAN, UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT, EARL SONDARS, SHANETTA Y. CUTLAR, TAMMIE GREGG, MARK KAPPELHOFF, JOHN DOE(Phone Clerk for Coordination and Review, DOJ, in their professional and individual capacities), JANE DOE(Phone Clerk for Coordination and Review, DOJ, in her professional and individual capacities), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(Phone Clerk for Special Litigation, DOJ, in her professional and individual capacities), JOHN DOE(Phone Clerk for Criminal Review, DOJ, in his professional and individual capacities), JANE DOE(Phone Clerk for Criminal Review, DOJ, in her professional and individual capacities), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE(IT Department of the DOJ, in his professional and individual capacities), JANE DOE(IT Department of the DOJ, in her professional and individual capacities), JOHN E. POTTER, POSTMASTER GENERAL, RODNEY GRADEN, JOHN DOE(Box Clerk at the U.S. Postal Service, in his professional and individual capacities), JANE DOE(Box Clerk at the U.S. Postal Service, in her professional and individual capacities), FEDERAL EEO AND CIVIL RIGHTS EXECUTIVES, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, WASHINGTON STATE HUMAN RIGHTS COMMISSION, DEPARTMENT OF COORDINATION AND REVIEW FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MASSACHUSETTS NOTARY PUBLIC AND LEGAL SERVICES, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND WORKFORCE, TENNESSEE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JIM MORROW, ALL DEFENDANTS, DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL REVIEW FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF SPECIAL LITIGATION FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FBI, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013206) filed by JAMES NEUMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint (part 2), # (2) Complaint (part 3), # (3) Complaint (part 4), # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Summons Issued
          Summons (25) Issued as to GEORGE W. BUSH, SCOTT J. BLOCH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MERRILY FREIDLANDER, TRISTAN MARTIN, LUZ LOPEZ-ORTIZ, ANDREW M. STRONGJY, CHRISTINE STONEMAN, EARL SONDARS, JOHN E. POTTER, POSTMASTER GENERAL, RODNEY GRADEN, JIM MORROW, ALL PLAINTIFFS. (tg, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 114 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?