LICUDINE v. WINTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01086-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MANUEL LICUDINE, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DONALD C. WINTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/24/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/31/2008 to defendant's motion to dismiss, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 8/27/08. (ms, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2008. (jwd)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of DONALD C. WINTER (Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DONALD C. WINTER served on 7/1/2008, answer due 8/30/2008. (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/25/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 6/25/2008, answer due 8/24/2008 (td, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Motion to Appoint Counsel
              MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MANUEL LICUDINE (tr)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MANUEL LICUDINE (tr)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against DONALD C. WINTER (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by MANUEL LICUDINE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tr)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                    SUMMONS Issued as to DONALD C. WINTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 06/19/2008. (tr )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 122 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?