LENNON v. VANDERMEY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01096-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TURIA PAIGE LENNON, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CARISSA VANDERMEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/25/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-NP, TYPE-H
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint by CARISSA VANDERMEY (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
    MINUTE ORDER granting [6] defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before October 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/28/2008. (VT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of CARISSA VANDERMEY (Owens, Cindy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CARISSA VANDERMEY served on 7/1/2008, answer due 8/30/2008. (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 7/2/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney., served on 7/2/2008, answer due 8/31/2008 (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TURIA PAIGE LENNON (tr)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against CARISSA VANDERMEY (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by TURIA PAIGE LENNON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(tr )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                SUMMONS Issued (3) as to CARISSA VANDERMEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                  MINUTE ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 06/23/2008. (tr)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 1,265 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?