FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE v. THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01139-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 11:05 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marvin Srulowitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jimmy Anthony Bell +1 301 599 7620 +1 301 599 7623 jimbellesq@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCGIVNEY & KLUGER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Michael Hannon +1 202 232 1907 +1 202 232 3704 jhannon@hannonlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo JAMES H. BILLINGTON, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo The Library Of Congress, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/30/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-H
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 24 defendant's motion to dismiss; granting 24 defendant's motion for a more definite statement; and granting 37 defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 4, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying 21 Plantiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 3, 2009. (lchhk2.) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION for Summary Judgment by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard L. Braddock)(Zachary, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Zachary on behalf of all defendants (Zachary, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS 1 AND 2 to re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE. (tr) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit to Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendants Library of Congress, et al. by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Roll Call - Police Fiasco - June 25, 2008, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Final Report to Congress on Age Discrimination in Employment Act Studies, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Of. Manely, # 2 Exhibit 2, Affiavit of Of. Rhines, # 3 Exhibit 3, Commendation to Of. Rollivard, # 4 Exhibit 4, Commendation to Of. Caul, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement and File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement and File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction filed by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 18 Amended Complaint by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2002 GAO Report, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 18 Amended Complaint by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER finding as moot 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 20, 2008. (NP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: # 1 order) (ztj, ). (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Amended Complaint by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE re 15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement (Bell, Jimmy) Modified on 11/18/2008 (tr). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Oppositions to Defendants Motions to Dismiss and for A More Definite Statement by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for More Definite Statement by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE Of Consent by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD (Meriweather, Robin)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 ERRATA
                                                                    ERRATA by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE [2] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [5] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [4] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [6] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE, [7] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC, [3] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipts)(Hannon, J.)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 7/23/08. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD served on 7/22/2008, answer due 9/22/2008. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE served on 7/25/2008, answer due 9/23/2008. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JAMES H. BILLINGTON served on 7/22/2008, answer due 9/22/2008. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS served on 7/23/2008, answer due 9/22/2008. (Hannon, J.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013380) filed by FATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS LABOR COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                    SUMMONS (6) Issued as to THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, JAMES H. BILLINGTON, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE, UNITED STATES CAPITOL POLICE BOARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?