IN T VELD v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01151-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 3:00 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF STATE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/1/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 9 the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the Department of Homeland Security. This case is dismissed and closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/15/08. (KD) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/15/08. (KD) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
      REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dodson Decl.)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
            Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Dep't of Homeland Security filed by SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Hasbrouck, # 2 Statement of Facts - Plaintiff's Response)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
              STIPULATION of Dismissal in Part by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Dispositive Motions by SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Dispositive Motions by SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vania T. Lockett)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Margaret P. Grafeld, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to complaint due by 9/11/2008. (cdw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [4] Defendants' Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than September 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/24/08. (lcrmc2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responses by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of all defendants (Kidwell, Judith)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Clare Hofmann on behalf of SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD (Hofmann, Marcia)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013440) filed by SOPHIA HELENA IN T VELD. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Summons Issued
                                          Summons (5) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 234 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?