AL-NASHIRI et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01207-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2020 at 2:24 PM ST (5.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul G. Turner +1 702 388 6577 paul_turner@fd.org
v.
No Logo BRUCE VARGO, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo CONDELEEZA RICE, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo DAVID M. THOMAS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo GEORGE TENET, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Respondent
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Respondent
Officially listed as "RICHARD B. CHENEY"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/15/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags GITMO, TYPE-G
  Entries (308) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Writ
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION To Supplement re 278 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Paradis, Michel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Paradis, Michel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Paradis, Michel)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE Regarding Camp Five Echo Block by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE Regarding Camp Iguana by ALL RESPONDENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE in Connection With the Courts' Orders of December 28, 2016, and January 23, 2017 by ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 274 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying 270 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 271 Motion to Stay; denying 270 Motion to Clarify; denying 272 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/19/2017. (lcrcl3, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE re 270 MOTION for Reconsideration re 268 Order MOTION to Clarify, 271 MOTION to Stay re 268 Order , 272 MOTION for Order filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Paradis, Michel)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Cross Motion and in Opposition to Respondents Motion for Reconsideration)(Paradis, Michel)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Stay re 268 Order by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 268 Order by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order (Reconsideration), # 5 Text of Proposed Order (Clarification))(Wolfe, Kristina). Added MOTION to Clarify on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT- Memorandum to 260 Notice (Other) Petitioner's Motion for a Preservation Order by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO. (Wolfe, Kristina)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    PRESERVATION ORDER re 260 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, 265 Reply to Document filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER to conduct review of classification status re: 260 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying 261 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 265 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY re 262 Response to Document, Motion for a Preservation Order filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Paradis, Michel)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Respondents' Interim Response to Petitioner's Motion for a Preservation Order by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO re 262 Response to Document, (Wolfe, Kristina)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MANDATE of USCA as to 252 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. USCA Case Number 15-5020 Consolidated with 15-1023. (Attachments: # 1 judgment filed August 30, 2016)(zrdj)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 262 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE re 260 Notice (Other) of Petitioner's Motion for a Preservation Order filed by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Motion for a Preservation Order by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 260 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion for a Preservation Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Paradis, Michel)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ERRATA to Notice to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO (239 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1876 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 264 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 452 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 101 in 1:09-cv-00031-UNA, 360 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 277 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 287 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 234 in 1:05-cv-01983-UNA, 413 in 1:08-cv-01360-UNA, 673 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 279 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 175 in 1:05-cv-01623-UNA, 171 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 126 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 2005 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 422 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 410 in 1:05-cv-01048-UNA, 301 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 351 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 149 in 1:07-cv-02337-UNA, 241 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 22 in 1:08-cv-01645-RJL, 222 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 1088 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA, 403 in 1:05-cv-02479-UNA, 481 in 1:05-cv-00569-UNA, 184 in 1:08-cv-01238-UNA, 255 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 152 in 1:06-cv-01725-EGS, 155 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL, 255 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 2053 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 122 in 1:05-cv-02348-EGS, 356 in 1:05-cv-01607-RCL, 450 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 258 in 1:08-cv-01207-RCL, 1063 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 185 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 127 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 321 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 309 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 328 in 1:05-cv-00023-UNA) Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to Court, # 2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Order, ;USCA Case Number 15-5020. (jf, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER of USCA ( as to 252 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. That the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance. That this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. USCA Case Number 15-5020. (erd) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marc A. Hearron on behalf of RETIRED MILITARY ADMIRALS, GENERALS, AND COLONELS Substituting for attorney Robert A. Salerno (Hearron, Marc)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 252 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 251 Memorandum & Opinion, by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Paradis, Michel)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: 12/29/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the respondents' motion 237 to hold in abeyance, denying petitioner's motion 228 for a preliminary injunction, granting petitioner's motion 230 for leave to amend his petition for habeas, denying without prejudice motions 232 244 for leave to file an amicus brief and for proposed amici to participate in oral argument. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/29/2014. (DCL)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None USCA Order (No Link)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (certified copy) USCA Case Number 14-5229. Upon consideration of the petition for a writ of mandamus and the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for a writ of mandamus be denied without prejudice to refiling. (kb) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing re Writ of Mandamus by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II re 246 Notice (Other) (Prince, Robert)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 244 MOTION of Amici Curiae to Participate in Oral Argument of Petitioner's Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION of Amici Curiae to Participate in Oral Argument of Petitioner's Preliminary Injunction Motion by RETIRED MILITARY ADMIRALS, GENERALS, AND COLONELS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salerno, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing for Petitioner's Reply In Support of Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of 237 Cross Motion to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Prince, Robert) Modified on 6/12/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Hearing Schedule by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hollander, Nancy) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 237 Cross MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings In Opposition to Respondents' Cross-Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 A)(Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Regarding Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Respondents Cross-Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) Modified on 5/29/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Cross MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 A - Al-Nashiri Charge Sheet, # 3 B - Directions of Convening Authority, # 4 C - Government Response To Defense Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 230 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15(d) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 A - Al-Nashiri Charge Sheet, # 2 B - Directions of Convening Authority, # 3 C - Government Response To Defense Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 228 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 A - Al-Nashiri Charge Sheet, # 2 B - Directions of Convening Authority, # 3 C - Government Response To Defense Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Cullen Barton on behalf of DAVID GLAZIER (Barton, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 230 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15(d) Supplemental Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Memorandum as Amicus Curiae by DAVID GLAZIER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum of Amicus Curiae David Glazier, # 2 Affidavit of David W. Glazier in Support of Proposed Memorandum of Amicus Curiae, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioner by RETIRED MILITARY ADMIRALS, GENERALS, AND COLONELS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Salerno, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15(d) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 219 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, 228 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, 227 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Corrected Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 219 Notice (Other) (Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. McIntosh on behalf of DAVID GLAZIER (McIntosh, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to File Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DAVID GLAZIER (McIntosh, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Amicus Curiae of Intent to File Amicus Brief in Support of Petitioners' Preliminary Injunction Motion by Retired Military Admirals, Generals, and Colonels (Salerno, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Somnath Raj Chatterjee, :Firm- Morrison & Foerster LLP, :Address- 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-268-7000. Fax No. - 415-268-7522 by Retired Military Admirals, Generals, and Colonels (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Salerno, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James J. Brosnahan, :Firm- Morrison & Foerster LLP, :Address- 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-268-7000. Fax No. - 415-268-7522 by Retired Military Admirals, Generals, and Colonels (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Salerno, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Norwood, Ryan) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 212 Substitution of Counsel, 213 Substitution of Counsel Response to Notice of Counsel Substitution and Appearance Filed April 7, 2014 filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Norwood, Ryan) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michel Paradis on behalf of ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Paradis, Michel) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nancy Hollander on behalf of ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI Substituting for attorney Ryan Norwood (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nancy Hollander on behalf of ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI Substituting for attorney Ryan Norwood (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding - Michel Paradis by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 80 Order,, 79 Order, (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding - Richard Kammen by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 80 Order,, 79 Order, (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 80 Order,, 79 Order, (Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard Kammen, :Firm- Kammen & Moudy, :Address- 135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1175, Indianapolis, IN 46204. Phone No. - 317-236-0400. Fax No. - 317-236-0404 by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollander, Nancy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Norwood, Ryan) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Ryan Neil Norwood on behalf of ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI Substituting for attorney Paul G. Turner, Gerald Bierbaum, Franny Forsman (Norwood, Ryan) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 199 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ORDER. Public version of Memorandum Order dated October 11, 2012, denying 195 petitioner's motion for reconsideration of Judge Sullivan's May, 2012 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 1, 2012. (lcegs4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re Order,, (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PETITIONERS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A REPLY TO THE GOVERNMENTS TS/SCI FILING by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re Order,, (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10015 filed by RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 E, # 4 Exhibit 3 N, # 5 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10015 by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 81 Notice of Appeal filed by ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN ; USCA Case Number 09-5027. ORDERED that the order to show cause be discharged. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the district court's order requiring advance notice of transfer is hereby vacated. (kb) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER transferring subject of the government's classified filing of March 24, 2011, to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 04/18/2011. (DCL) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO THE GOVERNMENTS EX PARTE TS/SCI FILING by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) This entry has been transferred by consent to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/19/2011 (ds). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO THE GOVERNMENTS EX PARTE TS/SCI FILING by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) Modified on 4/11/2011 (jf, ). (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK H. OBAMA, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) This entry has been transferred by consent to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/19/2011 (ds). (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRESERVATION ORDER REQUIRING GOVERNMENT TO MAINTAIN SPECIAL PROSECUTOR DURHAMS INVESTIGATIVE FILES by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 179 Notice (Other) Opposition to Petitioner's Second Supplemental Motion for A Preservation Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, BARACK H. OBAMA, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Supplemental Motion for Preservation Order Requiring Government to Maintain Special Prosecutor Durham's Investigative Files by RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, CONDELEEZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Turner on behalf of ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 MOU - Franny Forsman)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, ABDUL AL RAZZAQ MUHAMMAD SALIH, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, SHAWALI KHAN, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, YAKUBI, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, SAMI AL HAJJ, OBAYDULLAH, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SALEM AHMED HADI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, FNU HAFIZULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Supreme Court of the United States, (Sup. Crt. Case No. 09-5812, USCA Case No. 08-1007) The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (kb) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Classified Errata to Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Order (1) Permitting Inspection and Copying of Petitioners Medical Records and (2) Reasonable Access to Petitioner by a Medical/Mental Health Professional for a Medical/Ment al Health Evaluation at the Location of Petitioners Imprisonment Or, Alternatively, at a Location to Which Petitioner Is Transported Without the Covering of Eyes and Ears by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET re 160 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Classified Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Order (1) Permitting Inspection and Copying of Petitioners Medical Records and (2) Reasonable Access to Petitioner by a Medical/Mental Health Professional for a Medical/Mental Health Evaluation at the Location of Petitioners Imprisonment Or, Alternatively, at a Location to Which Petitioner Is Transported Without the Covering of Eyes and Ears by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET re 159 Notice (Other) (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Motion for Order... by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Wiltsie on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Ex Parte Filing Regarding Task Force Review filed by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Regarding Task Force Review by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. Attorney Paul Edward Ahern terminated. (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Berman on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Documents by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Luh, James) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for Petitioner Nashiri (ISN 10015) by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Narrative, # 2 Appendix Part 1, # 3 Appendix Part 2, # 4 Appendix Part 3, # 5 Appendix Part 4, # 6 Appendix Part 5, # 7 Appendix Part 6, # 8 Appendix Part 7, # 9 Appendix Part 8, # 10 Appendix Part 9)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Traverse; "PETITIONERS SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A TRAVERSE" by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the respondents to file a status report by July 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/13/2009. (DCL) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Stay Respondents' Filing of Response to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Counsel by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A TRAVERSE by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE -- RESPONDENTS' GLOBAL NOTICE REGARDING PRODUCTION OF EXCULPATORY INFORMATION by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declararion Brown, # 2 Exhibit B-Declaration Abraham, # 3 Exhibit C-Status Report)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, BARACK H. OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Emergency Supplemental Motion for Preservation Order by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edward Ahern on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Ahern, Paul) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Respondents' Statement of Legal Justification for Detention filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing (Opposition to Respondents Motion for Extension of Time to File the Factual Return) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA Respondents Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification, (also filed as Dkt. No. 1656 in Misc. No. 08-442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (72 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 30 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 101 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 147 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 101 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 1043 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 52 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 85 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 45 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, DONALD RUMSFELD, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT GATES, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1655 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET re (1527 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance, (84 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Petitioners Reply To Respondents Opposition To Petitioners Motion for An Order Directing Preservation Of Discoverable And Relevant Evidence by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA TO PETITIONERS AND RESPONDENTS JOINT MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO HOLD PETITION IN ABEYANCE PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS FILED PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS FILED JANUARY 30, 2009, DOCKET #1566 (08-mc-442) & #94 (08-cv-1207) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (94 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to PETITIONERS AND RESPONDENTS JOINT MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DISMISS HABEAS PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO HOLD PETITION IN ABEYANCE PENDING COMPLETION OF MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 86 Notice (Other) Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for A Preservation Order filed by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, Acknowledgement and Affirmation (Gerald Bierbaum) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 80 Order,, (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, Acknowledgement and Affirmation (Paul G. Turner) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re 80 Order,, (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Scott Michael Marconda terminated. (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing A Motion For An Order Directing Preservation Of Discoverable And Relevant Evidence with the CSO by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Wolfe, Kristina) Modified on 1/16/2009 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Folio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER amending the Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION entered on January 7, 2009, and Amended Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION (attached as Exhibit 1). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/9/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA, IN HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S 12/17/08 ORDER (08-cv-1207; 06-cv-1690; 08-1cv-1360) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (1323 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (109 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 63 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR) Order (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Military Commission Charges by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Exception from Sequencing Regarding Factual Returns (also filed as dkt. no. 1443 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns for December 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order and Supplemental Amended Orders or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certification for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and to Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution of the Motion and any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on December 16, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re (1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Boumediene Case Mgmt. Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting hearing for December 10, 2008. (Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2008 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas F. Hogan.) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/2/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) by JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. MYERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER naming counsel for Petitioner Al-Nashiri and dismissing 08-cv-1085. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/1/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Scott L. Fenstermaker by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION; (SEALED) (td, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (46 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 820 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER attached staying due dates pending resolution of the Government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration 1004 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 21, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Of Classified Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit England Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Mueller Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Request Letter #1, # 4 Exhibit Request Letter #2, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re (751 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Response to Order of the Court Response to Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause and Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re (933 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Order granting permission to file a reply, expansion of page limit, and directing service of documents, (59 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF) First MOTION for Order Permitting Reply, Expansion of Page Limit and Directing Service of Documents filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Response by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (933 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Order granting permission to file a reply, expansion of page limit, and directing service of documents (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting government's motions to amend factual returns and amending the Court's July 11, 2008, order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/7/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (27 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 51 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 106 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 99 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 141 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 36 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 98 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 628 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 71 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 109 in 1:05-cv-02398-RMU, 81 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 128 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 316 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 24 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 5 in 1:08-cv-01628-PLF, 89 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 69 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 104 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 120 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 26 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 272 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 83 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 68 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 87 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 86 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 186 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 64 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 80 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 47 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 131 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 87 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 125 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 134 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 47 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 80 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 66 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 97 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 148 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 43 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 139 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 26 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 82 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 62 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 102 in 1:05-cv-01602-RMU, 86 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 48 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 75 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 151 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 57 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 58 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 143 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 63 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 723 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 70 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 91 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 41 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 120 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 223 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 64 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 104 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 83 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 68 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 22 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 78 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 96 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 37 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 86 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 37 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 177 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 26 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMC) MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER. (Mason, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Mason on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER (Mason, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/6/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT of Oct.31, 2008 Regarding Filing of Factual Returns by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re (49 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF) Response to Order of the Court, (751 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Response to Order of the Court filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Response to Order to Show Cause by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (46 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 820 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Stephen Needle on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (751 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Response to Order of the Court, (46 in 1:08-cv-01207-UNA, 820 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order, (753 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Notice of Proposed Order, (752 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Affidavit, (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (43 in 1:08-cv-01207-UNA) MOTION to Dismiss (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Responses due October 31, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/27/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE DIRECTOR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (19 in 1:08-cv-01207-UNA, 23 in 1:08-cv-01085-UNA, 266 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 6 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 65 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW) MOTION for Protective Order (Supplemental Reply) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT GATES. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Compliance by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re (642 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (docket # 42, 08-cv-1085; docket # 655, 08-mc-442) Motion To Expand Time. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/7/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Petitioner shall file a redacted version of ex parte filing by 10/9/08; Government shall file a reply by 10/15/08. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/6/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. By October 10, 2008, counsel shall show cause why the petition in 08-cv-1085 should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/3/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT PETITIONER'S STATUS REPORT (Redacted and cleared for filing by the CSO) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Writ PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (Redacted and cleared for filing by the CSO) by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 5 part 2, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Turner, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding the Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re (22 in 1:08-cv-01085-UNA, 5 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 18 in 1:08-cv-01207-UNA, 63 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 264 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT GATES. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in further support of Motion to Intervene re (32 in 1:08-cv-01085-UNA, 27 in 1:08-cv-01207-UNA, 74 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 24 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR) Notice (Other) filed by MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI. (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION re government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08 (lctfh1) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting (204) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (129) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01164-UNA; granting (227) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01194-UNA; granting (273) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01254-UNA; granting (41) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01937-UNA; granting (181) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02022-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02035-GK; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02046-UNA; granting (93) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02215-UNA; granting (122) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00023-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00247-UNA; granting (119) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00270-UNA; granting (152) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00280-UNA; granting (104) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00329-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00359-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00392-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00492-UNA; granting (138) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00520-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00526-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00569-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00634-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00748-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00763-UNA; granting (75) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00877-UNA; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00889-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00892-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00883-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00993-UNA; granting (56) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00998-UNA; granting (78) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00999-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00994-UNA; granting (135) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01048-UNA; granting (52) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01189-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01244-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01220-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01347-UNA; granting (101) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01353-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01429-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01458-UNA-AK; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01457-UNA; granting (87) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01487-UNA; granting (157) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01509-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01497-UNA; granting (98) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01490-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01504-UNA; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01506-UNA; granting (84) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01505-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01555-UNA; granting (106) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01592-UNA; granting (97) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01601-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01602-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01607-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01623-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01645-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01646-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01638-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01639-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01678-UNA; granting (114) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01704-UNA; granting (60) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01971-UNA; granting (72) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01983-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02010-UNA; granting (59) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02088-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02104-UNA; granting (83) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02185-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02186-UNA; granting (71) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02199-UNA; granting (89) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02249-UNA; granting (65) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02349-UNA; granting (116) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02367-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02371-UNA; granting (115) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02378-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02379-UNA; granting (37) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02381-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02384-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02398-UNA; granting (43) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02387-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02380-UNA; granting (549) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02386-UNA; granting (33) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02444-UNA; granting (58) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02385-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02479-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-00618-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01684-UNA; granting (34) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01668-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting (48) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01758-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01767-UNA; granting (30) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01759-JDB; granting (51) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01766-UNA; granting (46) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01761-UNA; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01765-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-01710-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02337-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02338-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-00987-UNA; granting (29) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01085-UNA; granting (20) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01104-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01101-UNA; granting (317) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01153-UNA; granting (22) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01185-UNA; granting (25) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01207-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01224-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01237-UNA; granting (14) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01228-UNA; granting (14) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01232-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01230-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01223-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01233-UNA; granting (11) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01221-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01227-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01236-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01238-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01229-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01235-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01231-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01310-UNA; granting (22) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01360-RWR; granting (6) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01440-UNA; granting (367) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:02-cv-00828-UNA. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re (317 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT GATES. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Motion to Intervene by MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI (nmw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, of Aug. 20, 2008 filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO RECONSIDER APPLICATION OF TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                petitioners shall respond by September 12, 2008, to the government's request that the Court enter the government's proposed TS//SCI Protective Order. (jwd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting (288) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (21) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:08-cv-01207-UNA; and granting (12) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:08-cv-01360-RWR. Accordingly, petitioners shall respond by September 12, 2008, to the government's request that the Court enter the government's proposed TS//SCI Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/25/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S STATUS REPORT by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008, Terminated: 8/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's August 19, 2008 Order by MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN (Dixon, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part (63) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting in part (22) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:08-cv-01085-UNA; granting in part (18) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:08-cv-01207-UNA; granting in part (5) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:08-cv-01360-UNA; and requiring briefing by August 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/19/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT GATES; (See Docket Entry No.: [63] in Miscellaneous Case No.: 08-442 TFH to view document) (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration of Application of Standard Habeas Protective Order and Request for TS/SCI Protective Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Status reports due by August 22, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/15/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION REQUEST THAT THE GOVERNMENT FILE NOTICE WITH THE COURT 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRANSFERRING PETITIONER FROM GUANTANAMO BAY by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI (Turner, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pursuant to transfer order of this Court, this case is administratively assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management. (jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (110 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 52 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01602-RMU, 86 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 41 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 21 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 48 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 17 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 18 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 69 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 62 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 39 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 18 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 45 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 144 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 63 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 78 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 35 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 94 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 30 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 77 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 82 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 25 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 74 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 20 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 55 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 97 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 112 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 47 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 27 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 37 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 40 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 173 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 18 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 93 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 84 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 63 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 195 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 122 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 136 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 10 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 7 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 67 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 57 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 88 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 49 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 71 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 40 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 44 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 62 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 115 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 22 in 1:05-cv-00995-JR, 18 in 1:05-cv-01590-JDB, 51 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 84 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 45 in 1:05-cv-02112-RBW, 43 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 59 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 40 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 61 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 100 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 14 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 47 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 78 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 15 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 67 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 26 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 49 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 72 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 40 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 217 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 131 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 108 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 256 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 75 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 51 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 67 in 1:05-cv-02398-RMU, 64 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 104 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 50 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 65 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 32 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 84 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 55 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 522 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 73 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 76 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 29 in 1:05-cv-01725-JR, 23 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 84 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 69 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 59 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 34 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 80 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC) MOTION for Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY ADDRESSING PROCEDURAL FRAMEWORK ISSUES filed by BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, ATAG ALI ABDOH, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, SHAKER AAMER, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SHAKER AAMER, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABDULZAHER, BISHER AL-RAWI, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, AHMED "DOE", SHAKER AAMER, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, FARID AHMED, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, BANDAR AL JAABIR, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, SAIF ULLAH, SHARAF AL SANANI, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, ADEL LNU, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, SAD AL MATERI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ADEL AL TUNISI, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDULLA, ADEL, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (MacLean, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT in Response to the Court's July 24, 2008 Order by ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET. (Marconda, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONERS STATUS REPORT by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI re [6] Order (Turner, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO (Marconda, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER lifting stays, vacating dismissals, entering protective order, requiring authorizations, and holding motions in abeyance. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/29/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/26/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM, JOINT by All Petitioners of Law Addressing Procedural Framework issues. (Kadidal, Shayana) Modified on 7/29/2008 to add text and to edit out parties. (ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Regarding Procedural Framework Issues by All Respondents (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) Modified on 7/29/2008 to edit out parties. (ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Status reports due by August 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/24/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA -- Corrections To Exhibts To Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6 -- Corrected)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Submitted Jointly By Petitioners and Respondents In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Petitioners' Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Respondents Exhibits)(Warden, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER transferring this case to Judge Hogan for coordination and management. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/21/2008. (DCL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET (Subar, Judry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN, MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. "Let this be filed" by Chief, United States District Judge Royce C. Lamberth (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?