PERRY v. RICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01216-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:51 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JANINE PERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CASHDAN & KANE, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Robert Cashdan +1 202 862 4353 +1 202 862 4331 dcashdan@cashdankane.com
Space Michael Gerard Kane +1 202 862 4329 +1 202 862 4331 mkane@cashdankane.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/16/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 97 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
COPY OF UNSEALED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION dated 8/30/11 signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jeb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/29/11.(zrje) Unsealed Purusant to Order 95 dated 12/20/2011.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION re [25, 26]. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/2009. (lcrcl4, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against CONDOLEEZZA RICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013739) filed by JANINE PERRY. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tr)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
          SUMMONS Issued (3) as to CONDOLEEZZA RICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 54 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?