NAVAB-SAFAVI v. BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01225-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 10:53 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF, LERNER, SIMON & SALMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Salzman +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 salzman@hellerhuron.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 412

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn N. Lerner +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 clerner@hellerhuron.com
v.
No Logo BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2009 Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Broadcasting Board Of Governors, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2009 Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2009 Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo DANFORTH AUSTIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2009 Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo GARY C. HOSFORD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES K. GLASSMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2009 Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo MARK MCKINNON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo MARY POGGIOLI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo SHEILA GANDJI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEVEN J. SIMMONS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
No Logo WAYNE D. GREENE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Michelle Meriweather +1 202 252 2538 +1 202 514 8780 robin.meriweather2@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/17/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-L
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Motion to Reopen Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 USCA Mandate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 USCA Judgment
                      USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 35 Notice of Appeal, filed by MARY POGGIOLI, GARY C. HOSFORD, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, SHEILA GANDJI, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, STEVEN J. SIMMONS, MARK MCKINNON, WAYNE D. GREENE ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause be affirmend and the case be remanded for all further proceedings. (zsmm) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 39 MOTION to Stay Discovery Or in the Alternative MOTION for Protective Order filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI. (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Motion to Stay
                          MOTION to Stay Discovery Or in the Alternative, MOTION for Protective Order by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 31 Amended Complaint, by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, DANFORTH AUSTIN, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                              Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government. Please disregard the first transmission re 35 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been filed re 35 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, ) Modified on 11/2/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, MARK MCKINNON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                    ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint, by BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Related document: 31 Amended Complaint, filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI.(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 31 Amended Complaint, by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Amended Complaint
                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANFORTH AUSTIN, STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI.(jf, ) Modified on 10/1/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Amended Complaint
                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI.(jf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying 28 Order granting in part and denying in part the individual defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/3/09. (lcesh2) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part the individual defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/3/09. (lcesh2) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/16/09. (gdf) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Surreply
                                                        SURREPLY to 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BBG Discovery responses, # 2 Exhibit email from Glassman, # 3 Exhibit email from Poggioli, # 4 Exhibit Notes from Ortiz, # 5 Exhibit email from Austin, # 6 Exhibit email from Hodge, # 7 Exhibit email from Hodge, # 8 Exhibit email from Belida, # 9 Exhibit email from Andross, # 10 Exhibit email from Arbabi, # 11 Exhibit email from Andross, # 12 Exhibit email from Glassman, # 13 Exhibit email from Andross, # 14 Exhibit email from Booker)(Salzman, Richard) Modified on 7/14/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT re 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) Modified to linkage on 6/11/2009 (jf, ). (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI. (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Salzman, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Salzman on behalf of MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI (Lerner, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Order on Motion for Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties appeared before the Court on February 5, 2009, for an initial scheduling conference. Initial disclosures shall be made by March 2, 2009. Discovery shall be completed by September 5, 2009. A further status conference is scheduled for September 8, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/5/2009. (lcesh2) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON re 12 MOTION to Dismiss (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, & Proposed Briefing Schedule by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for December 8, 2008, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/31/2008. (VT) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Answer
                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI.(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE of Consent to Enlargement by BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ls,)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013782) filed by MELODI NAVAB-SAFAVI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                          Summons (14) Issued as to STEVEN J. SIMMONS, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, JANICE H. BRAMBILLA, MARY POGGIOLI, WAYNE D. GREENE, GARY C. HOSFORD, SHEILA GANDJI, BROADCASTING BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JAMES K. GLASSMAN, JOAQUIN F. BLAYA, BLANQUITA W. CULLUM, D. JEFFREY HIRSCHBERG, EDWARD E. KAUFMAN, MARK MCKINNON. (jf, )
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?