RICHARDS v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01253-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:21 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward and Ward PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Sage Ward +1 202 331 8160 +1 202 503 1455 dan@wardlawdc.com
v.
No Logo BRIAN H., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/03/2010 Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
No Logo CIA DOES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
#1 - #20 (Employees of the Central Intelligence Agency, whose exact identity is unknown to Plaintiff at this time and/or is classified)
TERMINATED: 04/30/2009 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
No Logo GORDON P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/03/2010 Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
No Logo LEON PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/03/2010 Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
General - Director, Central Intelligence Agency
TERMINATED: 04/30/2009 Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
General - Director, Central Intelligence Agency
TERMINATED: 04/30/2009 Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/21/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 330 - Personal Injury: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-B
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia (rdj) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER signed by Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 7/15/11 granting 29 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint or, in the alternative, to transfer venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. The Court hereby ORDERS that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1404, 1406(a). (ad) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Beverly Maria Russell (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        Case Reassigned by Consent to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Chief Justice of the United States Supreme Court directing the designation and assignment of a United States District Judge for service in another circuit; assigning Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. of the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York to this case. (Signed by Chief Justice John D. Roberts on January 20, 2011. (jeb) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Beverly Russell (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
              REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Brian H., April 6, 2010)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case filed by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Margit Bleecker, MD, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of April Richards, # 3 Supplement Unpublished Opinion)(Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, BRIAN H., GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tracy W. Wofford, February 4, 2009, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jeb, ). (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                            STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, GORDON P., LEON E. PANETTA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION Removal of Documents from Docket by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively,, MOTION to Transfer Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA, GORDON P., BRIAN H. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tracy W. Wofford, Feb. 4, 2009, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                      CROSS MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or, MOTION to Stay Proceedings by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (See Docket Entry 22 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED CROSS-MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to LEON E. PANETTA served on 5/19/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LEON E. PANETTA, GORDON P., BRIAN H. filed by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS.(jf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay re 13 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tracy W. Wofford, Feb. 14, 2009, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Maria Russell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Russell, Beverly) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 2 Order to Show Cause filed by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/16/2008, answer due 2/17/2009; MICHAEL V. HAYDEN served on 12/16/2008, answer due 2/17/2009 (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/19/2008, answer due 2/17/2009. (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN served on 12/15/2008, answer due 2/13/2009. (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/15/2008, answer due 2/13/2009. (Ward, Daniel) Modified on 12/22/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General December 18, 2008. (Ward, Daniel) . (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General September 26, 2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 9/26/2008, answer due 11/25/2008 (Ward, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2008 (jf, ). Modified on 12/11/2008 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of mailing Summons and Complaint by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (Ward, Daniel) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. See Order for deadlines and information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/26/2008. (DCL) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CIA DOES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013809) filed by FRANKLIN A. RICHARDS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                Summons (3)Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CIA DOES #1 - #20. (jf, )
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?