CLEMENTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01252-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2020 at 5:03 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA CLEMENTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James H. Lesar +1 202 393 1921 +1 202 697 3699 jhlesar@gmail.com
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (165) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/3/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Contempt Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/26/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 134 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Order For Reconsideration by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified on 11/13/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 126 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing August 17, 2014 Supplement Notice of Filing by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/17/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing August 4, 2014 Supplemental Clemente Declaration by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1--Federal Review...)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Surreply by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Surreply, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 1--Lesar-AUSA, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 2--AUSA-Lesar, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 3--Routing Slip)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (Opposed) by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 105 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment RENEWED filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment RENEWED by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 105 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment RENEWED by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 105 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment RENEWED filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 2013 Second Clemente Case Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-16, # 3 Statement of Facts Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement of Material Facts in Dispute, # 4 Declaration Declaration of James H. Lesar)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Second Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Second Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-15, # 3 Affidavit 2013 Second Case Declaration of Angela Clemente)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of 2013 Second Case Declaration of Angela Clemente by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 2013 Second Case Clemente Decl.)(Lesar, James) Modified on 1/14/2014 (rdj). (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed), MOTION for Discovery by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-15)(Lesar, James) Modified on 1/9/2014 (znmw, ). Modified on 1/14/2014 (rdj). (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File 2d Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified on 1/14/2014 (rdj). (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Resond to FBI's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to to Revise Briefing Schedule by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Summary Judgment RENEWED by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hardy 5th)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Order for briefing schedule - joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Order to Stay Litigation in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 10/2/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Remaining Issues by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice 88 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 8/30/13. (Reed, Heather) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Itemizations by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Copy of Reply Brief by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Reply to Opp. to Mot. for Interim Award of Fees and Opp. to Mot. for Open America Stay, # 2 Exhibit Att. 1--Magistrate's Report in Oglesby, # 3 Affidavit Greenberg bill for Attorney Fees)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Oglesby, Magistrate's Report, # 2 Affidavit Greenberg Bill)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified event title on 8/7/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Interim Award of Attorney's Fees andCosts by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified on 8/7/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to FBI Opposition to Interim Fees by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE re 91 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaraation of James H. Lesar, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Clemente)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Attorney Fees by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James H. Lesar, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Clemente)(Lesar, James) Modified on 5/23/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to the Court by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT - Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Tricia Dianne Francis terminated. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part 51 defendants' motion for summary judgment and denying the remainder and 57 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on April 13, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Memorandum by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Second Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Attachments A-G to Second Suppllemental Memorandun in Further Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Statement of Facts Second Suppllemental Local Rule 7(h) Statement, # 4 Affidavit Sixth Supplemental Declaration of Angela Clemente, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Sixth Clemente Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified on 3/6/2012 (dr). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SURREPLY to Supplemental Memorandum filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 69 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) Modified on 12/20/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 71 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Further Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Francis, Tricia) Modified on 12/9/2011 to edit relationship (dr). Modified event title on 12/20/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER applicable to case going forward. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 12/6/2011. (lcbjr1) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 73 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum; Reply due by 12/9/2011. Signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 11/21/11. (jeb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Further Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Sixth Declaration of Angela Clemente by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 57 Renewed CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (dr) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum signed by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on 11/8/11. Defendants may file a reply in support of their Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by November 18, 2011. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Plaintif's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Lesar, James) Modified on 10/27/2011 to edit text (dr). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tricia D. Francis on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Christian Natiello (Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--JHL-FBI (110626), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Hardy-JHL (110712), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3--NYT Article (970304))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case reassigned by consent to Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein. Judge Paul L. Friedman no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; (See docket entry no. 63 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 51 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 43 plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of this court's opinion of 9/28/10. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2011. (MA) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Reply for their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 51 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (See Docket Entry 57 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 06/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing (Corrected) re 57 Motion by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 6/27/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 thru 6, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Affidavit)(td, ) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/26/2011) (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing re 57 Motion by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 6/27/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 10 Declaration 4th Clemente Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Attachment A, Clemente Decl., # 12 Affidavit Bordley Affidavit)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A through C,part 1, # 3 Exhibit C, part 2, # 4 Exhibit C, part 3, # 5 Exhibit C, part 4, # 6 Exhibit C, part 5, # 7 Exhibit C, part 6, # 8 Exhibit C, part 7)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 43 Proposed MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 52(b) and Rule 59(e) filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(znmw, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration Out-of-Time, MOTION for Order by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideratin, # 2 Affidavit Second Supplemental Lesar Decl.)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Out-of-Time by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 43 Proposed MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 52(b) and Rule 59(e) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Proposed Scheduling Order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Natiello, Christian) Modified event title on 10/14/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 52(b) and Rule 59(e) by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment with regard to Count II of her complaint, which challenges the FBI's denial of her request for a fee waiver; All pending motions for summary judgment are denied without prejudce as to the remaining two counts of the complaint. The FBI shall supplement its Vaughn index as directed in this opinion. The parties are directed to file a proposed case management plan and schedule for future proceedings in this case on or before October 13, 2010. An order accompanying this opinion is issued this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 28, 2010. (MA) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying with prejudice 34 defendants' supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment; denying with prejudice 10 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment as to Count II and denying without prejudice as to Counts I and III of her second amended complaint. Judgment is entered for the plaintiff on Count II of her second amended complaint. The FBI shall supplement its Vaughn index as directed in the opinion accompanying this order; the parties shall file a proposed case management plan and schedule for future proceedings in this case on or before October 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 28, 2010. (MA) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A--Judge Reichbach's Decision and Order, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B--Michael Daly in NY Daily News)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to in Oppositon to Defendant's Supplelmental Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bordley Affidavait, # 2 Affidavit 2d Supplemental Celemente Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Att. A--AP Article, # 4 Exhibit Att. B--Clarion-Ledger Article)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Supplemental Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hardy (Second), # 2 Exhibit A, B, and C to Second Hardy Declaration)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 25 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Cllemente Decl., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Veccione letter, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Dillard Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3--New Yorker Article by Dannen)(Lesar, James) Modified on 6/26/2009 (nmw, ). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's July 9, 2008 letter)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment; exhibits by ANGELA CLEMENTE; (See Docket Entry no. 23 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Out of Time. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/19/2009. (mm) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memoradum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Clemene Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 19 Statement of Facts Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement, # 20 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Out-of-Time)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for One-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before 3/11/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/11/2009. (mm) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before 3/10/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/5/2009. (mm) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule by ANGELA CLEMENTE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE.(td, ) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 11 plaintiff's motion for leave to file a supplemental complaint; denying 12 plaintiff's motion to stay proceedings as regards defendants' pending motion for summary judgment until after defendants file a supplemental motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Use Post Office Box on Complaint Rather than Residence by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Staying Proceeding with Respect to Defendants' Pemding Motion for Summary Judgment by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1--Judge Syder's Report, # 2 Supplement Suppllemental Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Clemente-FBI (080412), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Clemente-FBI (080521), # 5 Exhibit Hardy-Cemente (080609), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4--JHL-Hardy (080709), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5--JHL-Hardy (080818), # 8 Exhibit JHL-Hardy (080819), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7--Hardy-JHL (081010), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8--JHL-Pustay (081202), # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9--JHL-Hardy (080709))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A-H, # 3 Exhibit Clemente documents 1-50, # 4 Exhibit Clemente documents 51-100, # 5 Exhibit Clemente documents 101-150, # 6 Exhibit Clemente documents 151-200, # 7 Exhibit Clemente 201-250, # 8 Exhibit Clemente documents 251-300, # 9 Exhibit Clemente documents 301-350, # 10 Exhibit Clemente 351-400, # 11 Exhibit Clemente documents 401-450, # 12 Exhibit Clemente documents 451-500)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [3] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion on or before September 22, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 26, 2008. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that defendant shall file a dispositive motion on or before September 22, 2008. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 26, 2008. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2008. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 (Natiello, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Post Office Address by ANGELA CLEMENTE (Lesar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013807) filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(tr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued (3) as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOHN DOE AGENCIES 1-10. (tr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?