MYVETT v. WILLIAMS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01284-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARRINGTON MYVETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Branch +1 202 785 2805 +1 202 785 0289 dablaw@erols.com
v.
No Logo CAROL D. HOLLOWAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo Juanita Barnes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS H. WILLIAMS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo VAN SPIVEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/25/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 08ca3514[Superior Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-B
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum in opposition to re [2] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by BARRINGTON MYVETT. (Branch, David)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
    Receipt on 08/06/08 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 08ca3514. (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by THOMAS H. WILLIAMS, CAROL D. HOLLOWAY, VAN SPIVEY, JUANITA BARNES (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Removal
        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS H. WILLIAMS, CAROL D. HOLLOWAY, VAN SPIVEY, JUANITA BARNES ( Filing fee $ 0.00 ) filed by THOMAS H. WILLIAMS, CAROL D. HOLLOWAY, VAN SPIVEY, JUANITA BARNES. (Attachments: # (1) Notice to Counsel, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 136 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?