NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01363-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 4:01 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell S. Bernard +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 mbernard@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Michael Bloom +1 212 727 4417 +1 212 727 1773 abloom@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Colangelo +1 202 289 2376 +1 202 289 1060 acolangelo@nrdc.org
Space Selena K. Kyle +1 415 875 6100 +1 415 875 6161 skyle@nrdc.org
Space Nancy Sharman Marks +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 nmarks@nrdc.org
No Logo DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell S. Bernard +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 mbernard@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Michael Bloom +1 212 727 4417 +1 212 727 1773 abloom@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Colangelo +1 202 289 2376 +1 202 289 1060 acolangelo@nrdc.org
Space Selena K. Kyle +1 415 875 6100 +1 415 875 6161 skyle@nrdc.org
Space Nancy Sharman Marks +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 nmarks@nrdc.org
No Logo Natural Resources Defense Council, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell S. Bernard +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 mbernard@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Michael Bloom +1 212 727 4417 +1 212 727 1773 abloom@nrdc.org
Space Aaron Colangelo +1 202 289 2376 +1 202 289 1060 acolangelo@nrdc.org
Space Selena K. Kyle +1 415 875 6100 +1 415 875 6161 skyle@nrdc.org
Space Nancy Sharman Marks +1 212 727 2700 +1 212 727 1773 nmarks@nrdc.org
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
No Logo REUBEN JEFFREY, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/6/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365 Environmental Matters
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Appearance by Luther L. Hajek on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, REUBEN JEFFREY, III (Hajek, Luther)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
    MINUTE ORDER granting [6], [7], [8], [9] Plaintiffs' Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and further ORDERED that Mitchell S. Bernard, Aaron M. Bloom, Selena K. Kyle, and Nancy S. Marks may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/18/2008. (lcrjl1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 ERRATA
      ERRATA Documenting Service on Defendants by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION [6] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron M. Bloom, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron M. Bloom, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 filed by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., [9] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Selena K. Kyle, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 111 Sutter Street, 20th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94110-1131. Phone No. - (415) 875-6100. Fax No. - (415) 875-6161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Selena K. Kyle, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 111 Sutter Street, 20th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94110-1131. Phone No. - (415) 875-6100. Fax No. - (415) 875-6161 filed by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., [7] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mitchell S. Bernard, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mitchell S. Bernard, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 filed by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., [8] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy S. Marks, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy S. Marks, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 filed by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. (Colangelo, Aaron)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Selena K. Kyle, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 111 Sutter Street, 20th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94110-1131. Phone No. - (415) 875-6100. Fax No. - (415) 875-6161 by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy S. Marks, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mitchell S. Bernard, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron M. Bloom, :Firm- Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., :Address- 40 West 20th Street, New York, NY 10011-4231. Phone No. - (212) 727-2700. Fax No. - (212) 727-1773 by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Colangelo, Aaron)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/08/2008. (lcrjl1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (jf, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                      LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (jf, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, REUBEN JEFFREY, III ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616014192) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                          SUMMONS (5) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, REUBEN JEFFREY, III, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jf, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 456 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?