IN RE: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-mc-00525-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 7:02 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Burlodge Ltd., Petitioner
Officially listed as "BURLODGE LIMITED"

Toggle Switch Represented by TYCKO & ZAVAREEI, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan K. Tycko +1 202 973 0900 +1 202 973 0950 jtycko@tzlegal.com
v.
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Respondent
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
No Logo Standex International Corporation, Respondent
Officially listed as "STANDEX INTERNATIONAL CORP."
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/15/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Motion to Compel
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/3/09. (lcjmf1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ERRATA. MEMORANDUM OPINION. The Memorandum Opinion issued on April 28, 2009, contained a typographical error on page 11 where the subpoena was mistakenly identified as having been propounded by the DVA. The opinion entered here contains the appropriate correction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 5/4/09. (lcjmf1)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 4/28/09. (lcjmf1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion for Order
        Consent MOTION for Order for Briefing Schedule on Burlodge Limited's Motion to Compel by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          MINUTE ORDER. The [3] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted subject to certification that Charles L. Riddle is familiar with the local rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 25, 2008. (lcckk1) Modified on 8/25/2008 (lcckk1).
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles L. Riddle, :Firm- HARDING, EARLEY, FOLLMER & FRAILEY, :Address- 86 The Commons at Valley Forge East, 1288 Valley Forge Road, P.O. Box 750, Valley Forge, PA 19482-0750. Phone No. - (610) 935-2300. Fax No. - (610) 935-0600 by BURLODGE LIMITED (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Charles L. Riddle, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, ) Modified on 8/19/2008 to reflect correct filing date of 8/15/08 (jeb, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
              LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BURLODGE LIMITED (jeb, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Motion to Compel
                MOTION to Compel the Department of Veteran Affairs to Comply with Subpoena by BURLODGE LIMITED (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(jeb, ) Modified on 8/19/2008 (jeb, ).
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 142 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?