ABDULMALIK et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01440-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 28, 2021 at 7:38 PM DT (3.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Prisoner Andy P. Hart +1 419 259 7370 +1 419 259 7375 andy_hart@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Prisoner Omar A. Farah +1 212 614 6485 +1 212 614 6499 ofarah@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Prisoner Edward G. Bryan +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 edward_bryan@fd.org
Prisoner Amy B. Cleary +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 amy_cleary@fd.org
Prisoner Claire Cahoon Curtis +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 claire_curtis@fd.org
Prisoner Jillian S. Davis +1 216 522 4856 jillian_davis@fd.org
Prisoner Darin Thompson +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 darin_thompson@fd.org
Prisoner Vicki Werneke +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 1951 vicki_werneke@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Prisoner Dennis G. Terez +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 dennis_terez@fd.org
Prisoner Carlos Warner +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 carlos_warner@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clive A. Stafford Smith +01144 207 353 4640 +01144 207 353 4641 clivess@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cori Crider +1 114 420 7353 +01144 207 353 4641 cori@reprieve.org.uk
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 207 353 4640 +440 207 353 4641 zachary@reprieve.org.uk
No Logo SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clive A. Stafford Smith +01144 207 353 4640 +01144 207 353 4641 clivess@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REPRIEVE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cori Crider +1 114 420 7353 +01144 207 353 4641 cori@reprieve.org.uk
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 207 353 4640 +440 207 353 4641 zachary@reprieve.org.uk
v.
No Logo BRUCE VARGO, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ROBERT GATES, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/19/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags GITMO, TYPE-G
  Entries (294) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ERRATA to Notice to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO (239 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1876 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 264 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 452 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 101 in 1:09-cv-00031-UNA, 360 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 277 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 287 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 234 in 1:05-cv-01983-UNA, 413 in 1:08-cv-01360-UNA, 673 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 279 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 175 in 1:05-cv-01623-UNA, 171 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 126 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 2005 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 422 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 410 in 1:05-cv-01048-UNA, 301 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 351 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 149 in 1:07-cv-02337-UNA, 241 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 22 in 1:08-cv-01645-RJL, 222 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 1088 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA, 403 in 1:05-cv-02479-UNA, 481 in 1:05-cv-00569-UNA, 184 in 1:08-cv-01238-UNA, 255 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 152 in 1:06-cv-01725-EGS, 155 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL, 255 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 2053 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 122 in 1:05-cv-02348-EGS, 356 in 1:05-cv-01607-RCL, 450 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 258 in 1:08-cv-01207-RCL, 1063 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 185 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 127 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 321 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 309 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 328 in 1:05-cv-00023-UNA) Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice to Court, # 2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Petitioner's 216 Unopposed Motion for Six Month Extension of Stay is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 3, 2013, indicating whether counsel for the Petitioner has been able to meet with the Petitioner or otherwise determine how the Petitioner intends to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/21/13. (lcckk2) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION For Six Month Extension Of Stay re Order,, by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint) by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of May 16, 2012 by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of FIling Factual Return for ISN 10025 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Respondents' 189 Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10025 is GRANTED. By no later than April 13, 2012 Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return, attached as Exhibit 3 to Respondents' Motion, has been redacted, except for the information described in paragraph 12 of Exhibit 1, which Respondents agreed to release to the public. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/30/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. Attorney Vicki Werneke terminated. (Werneke, Vicki) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. Attorney Amy B. Cleary terminated. (Cleary, Amy) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to the Court's Order of Novembe 22, 2011 by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 202 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of August 24, 2011. Counsel for Petitioner may file a Joint Status Report no later than January 14, 2012. Petitioner may file any Renewed Motion for Additional Discovery no later than January 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/9/11. (dot ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of August 24, 2011 by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA re 200 to Respondents' Report Regarding Rebuttal Evidence and Discovery Certification by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (O'Donnell, Sean) Modified to add link on 11/7/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Classified Order of July 26, 2011 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order of July 26, 2011 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's July 26, 2011 Minute Order, a Redacted Version of the Court's Classified Order regarding Petitioner's Motion for Additional Discovery and Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider the Court's May 3, 2010 Order is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Unclassified//For Public Release Declaration of Mohammed Abdulmalik-Supplement To Motion To Obtain Additional Discovery In The Form of Depositions of Interrogators Pursuant to Amended C.M.O. I.E.2 (Filed November 5, 2010 With CSO) by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Ephraim Wernick terminated. (Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Reply to Respondents' Opposition by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Reconsider This Court's May 3, 2010 Order on Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Obtain Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re Order, (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(ztd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sean W. O'Donnell, Jr on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (O'Donnell, Sean) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ephraim Wernick on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Wernick, Ephraim) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Intent To Respond by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re 181 Notice (Other), 177 Notice (Other), Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE ofFiling Petitioner's Motion to Continue Traverse Deadline by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Petitioner's Reply To Respondent's Opposition To Motion For Additional Discovery by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File His Reply to Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion for Additional Discovery by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Davis, Jillian) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to CMO § I.E.2 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT of June 22, 2009 (Unclassified/for Public Release) by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE pursuant to August 2, 2010 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) Modified to add link on 8/13/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Joint STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Jointly Prepared by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Ex Parte Submission Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Pursuant to the Court's May 3, 2010, Minute Order, a Redacted Version of the Classified Order regarding Petitioner's discovery motions is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 18, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Classified Filing of Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, ABDUL AL RAZZAQ MUHAMMAD SALIH, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, SHAWALI KHAN, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, YAKUBI, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, SAMI AL HAJJ, OBAYDULLAH, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SALEM AHMED HADI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, FNU HAFIZULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis G. Terez on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (td, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Classified Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Motion For Leave To File Motion To Compel by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Juria Lynnette Jones on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Jones, Juria) (Main Document 152 replaced on 4/21/2010) (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Filing of Public Appendix To Classified Filings by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re 148 Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B-Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C-Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D-Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E-Declaration)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION (JOINT) by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Motion for Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing a Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Obtain Additional Discovery by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information Of Wendi Overmyer by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Appearance Of Wendi Overmyer by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009, Minute Order, a Redacted Version of the Classified Order regarding Petitioner's motion for expedited classification review is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply To Respondent's Motion by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing "Public Appendix" For Classification Review by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Reply to Respondent's Response To Petitioner's Request For Expedited Classification Review by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing A Motion To Expedite Classification Review Of Public Appendix To Classified Document by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing A Public Appendix to Classified Document by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel or for Further Discovery by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andy P. Hart on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Cleary, Amy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Amy B. Cleary on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Cleary, Amy) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bryan on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Werneke, Vicki) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki Werneke on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Werneke, Vicki) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Warner, Carlos) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Warner on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Warner, Carlos) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Davis, Jillian) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian S. Davis on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Davis, Jillian) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re (409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK) Order by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK. (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Darin Thompson on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Counsel and for Extension by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion for Substitution of Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crider, Cori) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Classified Supplement by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (Narrative), # 2 Appendix (Exhibits Part 1), # 3 Appendix (Exhibits Part 2), # 4 Appendix (Exhibits Part 3))(Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2009 Minute Order, Petitioner was provided "until Wednesday, July 15, 2009, in which to file a notice to the Court... indicating whether Petitioner consents to the deadline proposed by Respondents" in their July 7, 2009 Status Report, or the Court would "deem Petitioner to have conceded to Respondents' requested deadline." 7/8/09 Min. Order. As Petitioner did not file any notice with the Court on or before July 15, 2009 or anytime thereafter, the Court therefore holds that Respondents shall have until and including August 21, 2009 in which to disclose all responsive material pursuant to Paragraphs A and C.1 of the Court's June 25, 2009 Order. In addition, the Court advises Respondents that, to the extent they seek to modify their obligations under the CMO and the Court's June 25, 2009 Order, Respondents cannot seek to do so simply by setting forth their "understandings" of the Order in a Status Report. Rather, any requests for substantiative modifications must be made by separate order in compliance with the Court's 76 April 9, 2009 Scheduling and Procedures Order and must specifically explain the reasons for any requested modifications. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 21, 2009. (lcckk2 ) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's June 25, 2009 Minute Order, a Redacted Version of the Order Regarding Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Motion for Discovery is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 21, 2009. (lcckk2 ) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Johnson on behalf of ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Unseal Status Report by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Crider, Cori) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Classified Order of June 25, 2009 by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, ) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Respondents' counsel shall have an affirmative obligation to ascertain whether the Guantanamo Review Task Force has made a recommendation regarding the disposition of Petitioner and, if it has, to notify the Court of the same. If a recommendation regarding the disposition of Petitioner has been made, Respondents' counsel shall also have an affirmative obligation to ascertain whether the Review Panel has made a decision in connection with the recommendation and, if so, to notify the Court with the results of the decision. The obligations imposed on Respondents' counsel pursuant to the attached Order shall be immediate and ongoing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 16, 2009. (lcckk2 ) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Classified Filing by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to For Respondents to Respond to Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Motion for Discovery by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for Respondents to Comply with Section I.E.1 of Amended Case Management Order by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declararion Brown, # 2 Exhibit B-Declaration Abraham, # 3 Exhibit C-Status Report)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Motion for Discovery by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Crider, Cori) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crider, Cori) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of this Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 9, 2009. (lcckk2 ) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Certification Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to For a One-Day Extension of Time for Respondents to Comply with Section I.D.1 of Amended Case Management Order by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to For Respondents to Comply With Section I.D.1 of Amended Case Management Order by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of petitioner's signed authorization by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK; (FILED UNDER SEAL) (td, ) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum Regarding Detention Authority)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to for Respondents to Comply With Section I.D.1 of Amended Case Management Order by ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Frederick) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burke Walthall on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report, on or before April 1, 2009, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 5, 2009. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Sherwood Young on behalf of ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH (Young, Frederick) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA Respondents Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification, (also filed as Dkt. No. 1656 in Misc. No. 08-442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (72 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 30 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 101 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 147 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 101 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 1043 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 52 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 85 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 45 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, DONALD RUMSFELD, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT GATES, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1655 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY. (Bead, Jeanette) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Authorization by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # 1 Crider Decl.)(Crider, Cori) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re (45 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1571 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 37 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File, and Emergency Cross-Motion for Petitioners' CSRT Records filed by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, ISMAIL MOHAMED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit correspondence re: CSRT records, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crider, Cori) (Entered: 01/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1571 in No. 08-mc-0442) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Scott Michael Marconda terminated. (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Corporate Disclosure)(nmw, ) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re (150 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 226 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 40 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 378 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 92 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 134 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 425 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 55 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 105 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 828 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 42 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 87 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 14 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 183 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 86 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 111 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 94 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 124 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 60 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 157 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 76 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 159 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 118 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 78 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 174 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 31 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 113 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 155 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 105 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 101 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 316 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 153 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 137 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 101 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 127 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 61 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 179 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 95 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 73 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 107 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 95 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 120 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 44 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 94 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 12 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 157 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 77 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 137 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 223 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 133 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 176 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 130 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 118 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 128 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 166 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 135 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 69 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 112 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 120 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 22 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 75 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 120 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 100 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 117 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 78 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 7 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 31 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 154 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 68 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 132 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 46 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 185 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 131 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 60 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB) MOTION for Order, (166 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) MOTION for Order to Designate Unclassified Returns as "Protected" Information filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re (1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information filed by FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, PRIVILEGE TEAM, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dixon, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Exception from Sequencing Regarding Factual Returns (also filed as dkt. no. 1443 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns for December 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order and Supplemental Amended Orders or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certification for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and to Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution of the Motion and any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on December 16, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re (1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Boumediene Case Mgmt. Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting hearing for December 10, 2008. (Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2008 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas F. Hogan.) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/2/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) by JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. MYERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (116 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 116 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 116 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 95 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 95 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 95 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 21 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 21 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 21 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 703 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 703 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 703 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 90 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 90 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 120 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 120 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 120 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 148 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 148 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 148 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 79 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 79 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 79 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 97 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 97 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 97 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay filed by SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, JIHAD DHIAB, AHMED BEN BACHA, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, ISMAIL MOHAMED. (Katznelson, Zachary) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER attached staying due dates pending resolution of the Government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration 1004 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 21, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Of Classified Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit England Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Mueller Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Request Letter #1, # 4 Exhibit Request Letter #2, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by Clive Stafford Smith of Documents Required Pursuant to Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, SALAH BELBACHA, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI (Katznelson, Zachary) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting government's motions to amend factual returns and amending the Court's July 11, 2008, order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/7/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/6/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT of Oct.31, 2008 Regarding Filing of Factual Returns by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Regarding the Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION re government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08 (lctfh1) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (204) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (129) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01164-UNA; granting (227) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01194-UNA; granting (273) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01254-UNA; granting (41) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01937-UNA; granting (181) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02022-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02035-GK; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02046-UNA; granting (93) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02215-UNA; granting (122) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00023-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00247-UNA; granting (119) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00270-UNA; granting (152) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00280-UNA; granting (104) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00329-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00359-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00392-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00492-UNA; granting (138) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00520-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00526-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00569-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00634-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00748-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00763-UNA; granting (75) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00877-UNA; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00889-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00892-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00883-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00993-UNA; granting (56) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00998-UNA; granting (78) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00999-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00994-UNA; granting (135) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01048-UNA; granting (52) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01189-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01244-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01220-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01347-UNA; granting (101) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01353-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01429-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01458-UNA-AK; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01457-UNA; granting (87) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01487-UNA; granting (157) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01509-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01497-UNA; granting (98) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01490-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01504-UNA; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01506-UNA; granting (84) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01505-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01555-UNA; granting (106) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01592-UNA; granting (97) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01601-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01602-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01607-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01623-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01645-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01646-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01638-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01639-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01678-UNA; granting (114) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01704-UNA; granting (60) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01971-UNA; granting (72) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01983-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02010-UNA; granting (59) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02088-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02104-UNA; granting (83) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02185-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02186-UNA; granting (71) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02199-UNA; granting (89) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02249-UNA; granting (65) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02349-UNA; granting (116) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02367-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02371-UNA; granting (115) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02378-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02379-UNA; granting (37) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02381-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02384-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02398-UNA; granting (43) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02387-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02380-UNA; granting (549) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02386-UNA; granting (33) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02444-UNA; granting (58) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02385-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02479-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-00618-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01684-UNA; granting (34) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01668-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting (48) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01758-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01767-UNA; granting (30) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01759-JDB; granting (51) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01766-UNA; granting (46) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01761-UNA; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01765-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-01710-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02337-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02338-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-00987-UNA; granting (29) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01085-UNA; granting (20) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01104-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01101-UNA; granting (317) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01153-UNA; granting (22) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01185-UNA; granting (25) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01207-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01224-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01237-UNA; granting (14) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01228-UNA; granting (14) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01232-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01230-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01223-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01233-UNA; granting (11) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01221-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01227-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01236-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01238-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01229-UNA; granting (16) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01235-UNA; granting (15) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01231-UNA; granting (17) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01310-UNA; granting (22) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01360-RWR; granting (6) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01440-UNA; granting (367) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:02-cv-00828-UNA. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (317 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT GATES. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of MOU and Acknowledgment Required Pursuant to Protective Order Dated September 11, 2008 by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, SALAH BELBACHA, AHMED OMAR, SHARAF AL SANANI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI re (57 in 1:05-cv-01457-UNA, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 94 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 26 in 1:08-cv-01185-UNA, 96 in 1:04-cv-02215-UNA, 85 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 123 in 1:05-cv-00270-UNA, 107 in 1:05-cv-00329-UNA, 69 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-UNA, 62 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 79 in 1:05-cv-01607-UNA, 65 in 1:05-cv-00748-UNA, 93 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 185 in 1:04-cv-02022-UNA, 79 in 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-UNA) Order (Katznelson, Zachary) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Petitioners shall respond by Monday, September 8, 2008, to the government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order (08-mc-0442, docket number 317). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/11/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/30/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF JOINDER IN PETITIONERS' RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS' REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER by SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, JIHAD DHIAB, NABIL, AHMED BEN BACHA, AHMED OMAR, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK re (77 in 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK, 94 in 1:04-cv-02215-UNA, 55 in 1:05-cv-01457-UNA, 67 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 62 in 1:05-cv-00748-UNA, 120 in 1:05-cv-00270-UNA, 7 in 1:08-cv-01440-UNA, 357 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 557 in 1:05-cv-02386-UNA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Katznelson, Zachary) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Protective Order and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantnamo Bay, Cuba, # (2) Exhibit Order Supplementing and Amending Filing Procedures Contained in November 8, 2004 Amended Protective Order, # (3) Exhibit Order Addressing Designation Procedures for Protected Information)(Katznelson, Zachary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE AND SUMMARY OF FILING by MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Pemberton, Alan) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, of Aug. 20, 2008 filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: 8/23/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Henry, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: By August 26, 2008, the government shall file a response to petitioners' request that the Court amend the Standard Protective Order to require the government to do the following: "provide to [petitioners'] counsel and the Court a version of each court filing containing classified or protected information that is suitable for filing on the public record within two weeks of the original filing date." Joint Report In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order 3 n.1 (08-mc-442, docket # 170). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/20/08. (lctfh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pursuant to transfer order of this Court, this case is administratively assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management.(ds)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paup
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIAT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis."Leave to file without Prepayment of Cost GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/19/08. (See Cover of Petition to view) (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?