VAN RAVENSWAAY v. CHERTOFF et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01455-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ERIC S. VAN RAVENSWAAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant Kaplan +1 561 347 8337 +1 561 347 8292 usrelocserv@aol.com
v.
No Logo A. ESPIE, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "CONDOLEEZZA RICE"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo LISA BOBBIE SCHREIBER HUGHES, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL MUKASEY, Defendant
No Logo NATALIYA IOFFE, Defendant
No Logo WENDY WEBB, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 4, 2008. (SM)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Summons Issued
    Summons (3) Issued for Amended Complaint as to NATALIYA IOFFE, WENDY WEBB, A. ESPIE. (td, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Amended Complaint
      AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATALIYA IOFFE, WENDY WEBB, A. ESPIE, MICHAEL CHERTOFF, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL MUKASEY, LISA BOBBIE SCHREIBER HUGHES filed by ERIC S. VAN RAVENSWAAY.(td, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against MICHAEL CHERTOFF, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL MUKASEY, LISA BOBBIE SCHREIBER HUGHES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616014549) filed by ERIC S. VAN RAVENSWAAY. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Summons Issued as to AUSA
          SUMMONS (5) Issued as to MICHAEL CHERTOFF, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, MICHAEL MUKASEY, LISA BOBBIE SCHREIBER HUGHES and U.S. Attorney.(jf, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 170 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?