Remote Voice Mail Messaging And Management System
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08541239
Examiner Scott Louis Weaver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stabler, Jerry, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by MICHAEL A. SLAVIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Slavin +1 561 625 6575
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Stabler, Jerry, West Palm Beach, FL (US)
Filing Date January 2, 1995
Status Abandoned -- Failure to Respond to an Office Action
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 1212.03
Confirmation Number 9987
Group Art Unit 2601
Class / Sub-Class 379 / 67
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Assignments (0) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
    Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
      Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
        Final Rejection
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
          Date Forwarded to Examiner
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
            Response after Non-Final Action
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
              Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Non-Final Rejection
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 11/16/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Application Captured on Microfilm
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Initial Exam Team nn
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 10/2/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Preliminary Amendment
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?