Microwave Radio System With Software Configuration Of Operating Parameters

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08561228
Examiner Doris Ha To, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Doris Ha To
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Efraim,, Applicant

Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Efraim,, Cupertino, CA (US)
Filing Date November 20, 1995
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 114925-147543
Confirmation Number 7275
Group Art Unit 2611
Class / Sub-Class 455 / 127
Timeline
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Assignments (14) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Dismissed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?