Continuous Play Background Music System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08570007
Examiner Ellis B Ramirez, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Ellis B Ramirez
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Krikorian, Thomas M., Applicant

Represented by Novak Druce, LLP

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Krikorian, Thomas M., West Bloomfield, MI (US)
Filing Date December 8, 1995
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 27592-01055-US1
Confirmation Number 8996
Group Art Unit 2756
Class / Sub-Class 364 / 1000
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Assignments (4) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/6/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?