Teri Hinkle v. ARS National Services, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 13-12404

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 11:55 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107366376 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for Reinstatement and Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief filed by Teri Lynn Hinkle is returned unfiled because this case is closed. No further relief is available from this Court.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107341122 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
    Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee ARS National Services, Inc.. Service date: 01/27/2014 US mail - Appellant Hinkle; email - Attorney for Appellees: Aust, Bedard. (ECF: Jonathan Aust)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107309715 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
      ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle has failed to file an appellant's brief and appendix within the time fixed by the rules
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 01107218985 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
        Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle and Appellee ARS National Services, Inc.. The appellants brief is due on or before 12/02/2013. The appendix is due on or before 12/09/2013.
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107217258 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
          Appeal clerically reinstated as to Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle because appeal was erroneously dismissed on 10/17/2013. The Appeal fees have been paid..
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107213886 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
            ORDER RECALLED (See 10/21/13 Entry)***ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules--[Edited 10/21/2013 by ECM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107180923 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
              ORDER: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle is DENIED. [6930678-2] FMH
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107103187 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6930678-1]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107103181 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107063634 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                  USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle was filed on 06/21/2013. Docket Entry 52.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107034045 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                    TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Teri Lynn Hinkle. No transcript is required for appeal purposes.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107027654 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Henry Bedard, Jr. for ARS National Services, Inc.. (ECF: John Bedard)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107026135 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jonathan Kyle Aust for ARS National Services, Inc.. (ECF: Jonathan Aust)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107024739 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                          CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Teri Lynn Hinkle on 05/28/2013. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed.
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?