Cell Analysis Method Using Quantitative Fluorescence Image Analysis

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08605342
Examiner Toni R Scheiner, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Toni R Scheiner
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Iii, George P. Hemstreet, Applicant

Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Almon +1 202 772 8738
Space OMAR AMIN
Space GAURAV S. ASTHANA +1 202 772 8850
Space Raghav Bajaj +1 202 772 8866
Space Donald Robert Banowit +1 202 371 2600 dbanowit@skgf.com
Space Brian Baxter +1 202 772 8530
Space John Bednarz +1 202 371 2600
Space Richard Bemben +1 202 371 2600
Space SALVADOR M. BEZOS +1 202 772 8533
Space Dina Blikshteyn +1 202 772 8863
Space Daniel Block +1 202 371 2600
Space Branka Bogunovic +1 202 772 8727
Space Jay Bombien +1 202 371 2600
Space CYNTHIA M. BOUCHEZ +1 202 371 2600
Space LORI M. BRANDES +1 202 371 2600
Space Shawn Buchanan +1 202 371 2600
Space Paul Calvo +1 202 772 8846
Space Christian Camarce +1 202 772 8895
Space Jaime Canaves +1 202 371 2600
Space HELENE C. CARLSON +1 202 371 2600
Space Christopher Cherry +1 202 772 8822
Space MICHELE A. CIMBALA. +1 202 371 2600
Space RICHARD D. COLLER. +1 202 772 8764
Space Kyle E. Conklin,. +1 202 371 2600
Space David K.S. Cornwell +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 DAVIDC@SKGF.COM
Space JOHN M. COVERT, ESQ +1 202 371 8600
Space John Curry +1 202 321 8555
Space Cynthia L. Derenzo +1 202 772 8526
Space Nirav Narenda Desai +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 ndesai@skgf.com
Space Tracy-Gene G. Durkin +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 tdurkin@skgf.com
Space Peter Dykstra +1 202 772 8733
Space JASON E. EISENBERG +1 202 371 2600
Space Eldora L. Ellison +1 202 772 8508 eellison@skgf.com
Space Stephanie Elmer +1 202 371 2600
Space ROBERT W. ESMOND +1 202 371 2600
Space DONALD J. FEATHERSTONE +1 202 371 2600
Space Jason Fitzsimmons +1 908 229 2205
Space JEFFREY R. FOUGERE +1 202 783 6040
Space Adam Fowles +1 202 403 2126
Space Jeremiah B. Frueauf +1 202 371 2600 jfrueauf@skgf.com
Space Daniel Adam Gajewski +1 202 772 8774 dgajewsk@skgf.com
Space Christopher Gallo +1 202 772 8868
Space Miklos Gaszner +1 202 772 8727
Space Marsha Gillentine +1 202 772 8692
Space Jorge Alberto Goldstein +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 jgold@skgf.com
Space Lori Ann Gordon +1 202 772 8862 LGORDON@SKGF.COM
Space Michael Gross +1 202 772 8762
Space Elizabeth Haanes +1 202 371 2600
Space JOHN T. HARAN. +1 202 772 8643
Space Philip Harris +1 801 669 0394
Space Erin Heenan +1 202 772 8525
Space Colin C Heitzmann +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 cheitzmann@skgf.com
Space JEFFREY T. HELVEY +1 202 772 8675
Space Ross G Hicks +1 202 772 8578 +1 202 371 2540 rhicks@skgf.com
Space David Holman +1 202 371 2600
Space MICHELLE K. HOLOUBEK +1 202 772 8855
Space KENLEY K. HOOVER +1 202 772 8773
Space Darrin Hopper +1 202 772 8630
Space Brett Howard +1 602 770 4036
Space PETER A. JACKMAN +1 202 371 2600
Space Kathleen Kalafus +1 202 772 8528
Space Edward J. Kessler +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 ekessler@skgf.com
Space Ji-Eun Kim +1 202 371 2600
Space JUDITH U. KIM +1 202 371 2600
Space William Ladd +1 202 772 8691
Space MICHAEL Q. LEE +1 202 772 8674
Space Xiaoxiang Liu +1 201 497 5495 sliu@skgf.com
Space GABY L. LONGSWORTH +1 202 371 2600
Space Chenghua Luo +1 202 772 8753
Space MICHAEL R. MALEK +1 410 533 1922
Space Kristy Markos +1 202 772 8795
Space KAREN R. MARKOWICZ +1 202 772 8637
Space Kevin William McCabe +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 kmccabe@skgf.com
Space Michael V. Messinger +1 202 371 2600
Space Robert H. Millonig +1 202 371 2600
Space Robert Molitors +1 202 371 2600
Space YASSER M. MOURTADA +1 202 772 8812
Space TRACY L. MULLER, +1 202 371 2600
Space Joseph E. Mutschelknaus +1 202 371 2600
Space Mythili Nadella +1 202 772 8880 mnadella@skgf.com
Space Asha Nadipuram +1 202 772 8898
Space BONNIE W. NANNENGA-COMBS +1 202 371 2600
Space Kavon Nasabzadeh +1 202 371 2600
Space Jorge Negron-Garcia +1 202 371 2600
Space David Orange +1 202 772 8721
Space Michael Parsons +1 202 371 2600
Space Olga Partington +1 202 772 8626
Space Pranay Pattani +1 202 772 8684
Space Carlos Perez Toro 1 +1 +1 +1
Space Graham C. Phero +1 202 642 3596
Space Byron L. Pickard +1 202 772 8521 bpickard@skgf.com
Space Suresh B Pillai +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540
Space Ralph Powers +1 202 772 8876
Space Chunbo Qin +1 212 593 0486
Space Katrina Quach +1 202 371 2600
Space Michael B Ray +1 202 772 8569 +1 202 371 2540 mray@skgf.com
Space GRANT F. REED +1 202 772 8831
Space Ryan Richardson +1 517 420 5849
Space Mark W Rygiel +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 mrygiel@skgf.com
Space Scott A. Schaller +1 202 371 2600
Space Lauren Schleh +1 703 836 6400
Space Amirali Sharifi +1 202 772 8871
Space Timothy J. Shea, Jr. +1 202 772 8538 +1 202 371 2540 tshea@skgf.com
Space Xianfeng Shen +1 202 772 8575
Space Neil Shull +1 202 371 2600
Space Robert Sokohl +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 rsokohl@skgf.com
Space Michael D Specht +1 202 772 8756 +1 202 371 2540 mspecht@skgf.com
Space Ute Splittgerber +1 240 543 0881
Space Eric Steffe +1 202 371 2600
Space Deborah A Sterling +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540
Space Robert Greene Sterne +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540
Space Jonathan Tuminaro +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2540 jtuminar@skgf.com
Space ISHAN P. WEERAKOON +1 202 772 8638
Space RAYMOND J. WERNER +1 503 466 2294
Space Erin Wong +1 202 772 8786
Space Jon E. Wright +1 202 772 8651 jwright@skgf.com
Space Ni Yan +1 202 772 8889
Space Hao Yin +1 610 270 5048
Space Daniel Yonan +1 202 371 2600 +1 202 371 2600 dyonan@skgf.com
Space Yongmei Zhang +1 703 879 8389
Space Lei Zhou +1 202 772 8864
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Iii, George P. Hemstreet, Oklahoma City, OK (US)
Filing Date February 9, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 4444.8910000
Confirmation Number 7749
Group Art Unit 1642
Class / Sub-Class 435 / 6
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Approved in TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?