Free Space Image Communication System And Method

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08644439
Examiner Andrew W Johns, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Andrew W Johns
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Constant, Robert N., Applicant

Represented by The Aerospace Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Michael Reid, +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Constant, Robert N., Rancho Palos Ve, CA (US)
Filing Date May 13, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-301
Confirmation Number 4204
Group Art Unit 2721
Class / Sub-Class 382 / 100
Timeline
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/30/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?