Encrypted Data Storage Card Including Smartcard Integrated Circuit For Storing An Access Password And Encryption Keys

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08651205
Examiner Reba I Elmore, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Reba I Elmore
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jones, Michael F., Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Anderson +1 972 628 3600
Space David Doyle +1 972 628 3600
Space Tara Doyle +1 972 628 3600
Space Jacob LaCombe +1 972 628 3637
Space Ryan Loveless +1 972 628 3610
Space Robert McCutcheon +1 972 628 3600
Space William Munck +1 972 628 3600
Space Michael Rodriguez +1 972 628 3607
Space Daniel Venglarik +1 972 628 3621
Space David Weigand +1 972 628 3600
Space Emily White +1 972 628 3642
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Jones, Michael F., Nashua, NH (US)
Filing Date May 17, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P68429
Confirmation Number 3525
Group Art Unit 2318
Class / Sub-Class 395 / 491
Timeline
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Assignments (7) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/10/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/18/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 4 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?