Servo System Controlled By Master And Second Processors Through Memory Being Accessed For Read And Write By Processors In Separate Portions Respectively
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08673317
Examiner Moustafa M Meky, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saf, Asghar, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Saf, Asghar, Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date June 28, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 19516/129
Confirmation Number 6888
Group Art Unit 2317
Class / Sub-Class 395 / 800
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Assignments (10) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
    Issue Notification Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
      Drawing(s) Processing Completed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
        Drawing(s) Received at Publications
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
          Drawing(s) Matched to Application
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
            Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
              Issue Fee Payment Verified
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Mail Notice of Allowance
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Application Captured on Microfilm
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Initial Exam Team nn
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Preliminary Amendment
                              LREF

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?