Palomo v. U.S. Parole Commision
Federal Civil Lawsuit Guam District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00044
District Judge John S. Unpingco, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Patrick J. Palomo, Petitioner
v.
No Logo U.S. Parole Commision, Respondent
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Respondent
Office Hagatna
Filed 6/5/1997
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Guam
Terminated 8/28/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997 Judgment*
JUDGMENT - Dismissing Pet for WRit of Mandamus.; [RSN EOD 08/28/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 8-1) (cnv)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion
    MOTION to W/Draw & Dismiss Pet for Writ of Mandamus & Ord.; Filed by: PET Palomo, Patrick J. [RSN EOD 08/28/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 7-1) (cnv)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: 7/16/1997 Summons Returned Executed
      RETURN Of Summons In A Cv Action - U.S. Parole Commission, exec 07/16/97; [RMM EOD 07/17/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 6-1) (cnv)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 6/26/1997 Summons Returned Executed
        RETURN Of Summons In A Cv Action - U.S. Probation Office exec 6/26/97.; [RSN EOD 06/26/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 5-1) (cnv)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 Order
          ORDER Conditionally Grntng Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.; [RSN EOD 06/23/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 4-1) (cnv)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997 Generic GCMS Event
            CONSENT to t/Rel of Trust Acct Info & to Collect Fees fr Trust Acct.; Filed by: PET Palomo, Patrick J. [RSN EOD 06/19/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 3-1) (cnv)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion
              APPLICATION to Proceed W/O Prepayment of Fees & Affidavit.; Filed by: PET Palomo, Patrick J. [RSN EOD 06/19/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 2-1) (cnv)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Petition
                PETITION For Writ of Mandamus; Filed by: PET Palomo, Patrick J. [RMM EOD 06/10/1997] (ORIGINAL GCMS ENTRY 1-1) (cnv)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 89 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?