Apparatus Having Signal Processors For Providing Respective Signals To Master Processor To Notify That Newly Written Data Can Be Obtained From One Or More Memories
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08675304
Examiner Moustafa M Meky, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asghar, Saf, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trevor L Bannister +1 412 741 8400 BANNISTT@PEPPERLAW.COM
Space William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
Space +1 412 908 3268
Space John Brancolini +1 412 391 6431
Space Stephen P. Cole +1 617 348 1605 +1 617 204 5150 colesp@pepperlaw.com
Space Suparna Datta +1 617 204 5100
Space +1 617 216 0171
Space MARK DELUCA. +1 610 640 7855
Space N. Endejann +1 215 981 4077
Space Thomas J. Engellenner +1 617 204 5100 engellet@pepperlaw.com
Space Bryan Giles +1 302 281 3664
Space George Haight +1 617 204 5100
Space Joseph Theodore Helmsen +1 412 454 5804 +1 412 281 0717 helmsenj@pepperlaw.com
Space Joseph Holovachuk +1 215 981 4191
Space KATHLEEN A. JOHNSON +1 215 981 4000
Space Michael K Jones +1 215 981 4405 +1 215 981 4750 jonesmk@pepperlaw.com
Space PAUL K. LEGAARD. +1 610 640 7859
Space Gregory D. Len +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 leng@pepperlaw.com
Space Paul Levin +1 412 454 5855
Space Frank D. Liu +1 617 204 5117 +1 617 204 5150 liuf@pepperlaw.com
Space Noah V. Malgeri +1 617 204 5100 malgerin@pepperlaw.com
Space Alison L McCarthy +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 mccartha@pepperlaw.com
Space Raymond A. Miller +1 412 454 5000
Space Mead Misic +1 617 204 5100
Space Jay R Mitchell +1 617 970 2658 +1 215 981 4750 mitchejr@pepperlaw.com
Space REZA MOLLAAGHABABA +1 617 204 5100
Space Stephen Montgomery +1 412 454 5075
Space Aparna Nemlekar +1 412 454 5021
Space Michael A. Patane +1 215 981 4997 patanem@pepperlaw.com
Space Anthony Pisano +1 412 454 5894
Space Michael T Renaud +1 617 204 5103 +1 617 204 5150 renaudm@pepperlaw.com
Space ADAM RIZK
Space Cary Ruffner +1 412 915 6693
Space Pierre Santerre Queiroz de Olive +1 412 454 5878
Space Andrew W. Schultz +1 617 204 5100
Space Daniel M. Scolnick,. +1 610 640 7820
Space Neda Sharifi +1 904 415 9552
Space JOSHUA R. SLAVITT +1 215 981 4680 +1 215 981 2750 slavittj@pepperlaw.com
Space ERIK N. VIDELOCK +1 215 981 4027 +1 215 981 4750 videlocke@pepperlaw.com
Space Curtis Wadsworth +1 412 454 5000
Space GREGORY D. WILLIAMS +1 617 204 5100
Space JOHN A. ZURAWSKI. +1 610 640 7852
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Asghar, Saf, Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date July 1, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 133757.3
Confirmation Number 9422
Group Art Unit 2756
Class / Sub-Class 395 / 827
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Assignments (11) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
    Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
      Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
        Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
          Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - ARTIFACT
            Artifact sheet indicating an item has been filed which cannot be scanned (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Prosecution - RXOGNOTC
              Notice of Reexam Published in Official Gazette (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
                Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
                  Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
                          Petition Decision (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.DEC.COCI
                            Petition Decision routed to Certificate of Correction (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.STATUS
                                Petition for review/processing depending on status (8 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - COCIN
                                  Request for Certificate of Correction (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                    EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                      Fee Worksheet (SB06) (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.SPRE
                                        Petition for review by the Technology Center SPRE. (8 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
                                              Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
                                                Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Correspondence Address Change
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - COCIN
                                                    Request for Certificate of Correction (3 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                      Power of Attorney (3 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                        EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - COCIN
                                                          Request for Certificate of Correction (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - COCIN
                                                            Request for Certificate of Correction (2 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - N417
                                                              EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (2 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                                                                Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                                                                  Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                                                                    Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                        Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Issue Notification Mailed
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Drawing(s) Matched to Application
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Drawing(s) Processing Completed
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                Drawing(s) Received at Publications
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                  Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (8 Pages)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - TRAN.LET
                                                                                      Transmittal Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                                                                                        Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Issue Fee Payment Verified
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                            Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                                                              Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Mail Notice of Allowance
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/4/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                      Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                        Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                              Non Patent Literature (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                            Drawings-only black and white line drawings (1 Page)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                              Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Letter Restarting Period for Response (i.e. Letter re: References)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
                                                                                                                                  Miscellaneous Action with SSP (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                    Mail Notice of Restarted Response Period
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                        Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                          Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - 1449
                                                                                                                                            List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
                                                                                                                                              Non Patent Literature (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/1996, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                          Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                              Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                  Application Captured on Microfilm
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                            Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Reference (20 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Reference (83 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmittal of New Application (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                        Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                          Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                              Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Rejection (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Formal Drawings Required (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                          List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Examiner's search strategy and results (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oath or Declaration filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Specification (21 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Drawings-only black and white line drawings (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Claims (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?