Microprocessor-controlled Full-duplex Speakerphone Using Automatic Gain Control
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08699844
Examiner Daniel Swerdlow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Dettmer, David R., Applicant

Represented by Crawford Maunu PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Adriano +1 626 395 7801 sbadriano@adrianoassociates.com
Space John Albrecht +1 763 526 6350
Space Brian Batzli +1 612 336 4755 bbatzli@merchantgould.com
Space John Beard +1 612 766 8892
Space Robert Beck +1 612 915 9633
Space Thomas Bejin +1 313 528 4882
Space CHARLES BERMAN +1 310 586 7700
Space Raymond Bogucki +1 818 914 4673
Space Steven C. Bruess +1 612 336 4711
Space Linda M. Byrne +1 651 259 2302 lbyrne@ip-firm.com
Space Karen Canady +1 310 966 9400
Space Alan Carlson +1 612 436 9600
Space Charles Carter +1 414 297 5842
Space Philip Caspers +1 612 436 9617
Space James Chiapetta +1 763 494 2509
Space John Clifford +1 612 332 4616
Space Timothy Conrad +1 612 336 4625
Space Victor Cooper +1 310 641 8797
Space Robert J Crawford +1 651 686 6633 +1 651 686 7111 crawford@ip-firm.com
Space Ronald Daignault +1 404 954 5100
Space Leslie Dalglish +1 469 293 6256
Space JULIE DAULTON +1 612 336 4724
Space Janaki Davda +1 310 553 7973
Space Ben Davidson +1 310 473 2300
Space Mark DiPietro +1 612 746 4791
Space Robert T Edell +1 612 332 5300 +1 612 332 5300
Space Sandra Epp Ryan +1 612 455 3845
Space Michael Farber +1 760 268 9285
Space Gerald Fisher +1 650 329 9293
Space STEVEN V. FUNK +1 651 756 2839
Space +1 310 641 8797
Space Robert Glance +1 814 474 2303
Space Charles Golla +1 612 336 4786
Space Alan Gorman +1 404 954 5100
Space John Gould +1 612 336 4721
Space John Gresens +1 312 759 1934
Space Curtis Hamre +1 612 455 3802
Space Randall Hillson +1 612 332 5300
Space MARK A. HOLLINGSWORTH +1 952 854 2700
Space MARYSUSAN HOWARD +1 858 210 4433
Space Mikio Ishimaru +1 408 738 0592 efiling@ishimarulaw.com
Space Scott Johnston +1 612 371 5274
Space Joseph Kastelic +1 612 332 5300
Space Denise Kettelberger +1 612 766 7181
Space Alan Kowalchyk +1 612 336 4620
Space Katherine Kowalchyk +1 612 371 5311
Space Paul Lacy +1 651 439 8090
Space Michael B. Lasky +1 952 253 4106
Space Timothy Lindquist +1 612 436 9600
Space DAVID W. LYNCH +1 865 380 5976
Space Michael Mau +1 612 331 7415
Space Karen McDaniel +1 952 253 4100
Space Daniel McDonald +1 612 336 4637
Space Wendy McDonald +1 651 636 5937
Space WILLIAM MILLER +1 651 733 6649
Space Douglas Mueller +1 612 455 3804
Space Tyler Nasiedlak +1 612 373 6920
Space Albin Nelson +1 612 373 6900
Space Anthony Orler +1 310 201 1588
Space Daniel Pauly +1 612 746 4783
Space Vincenzo Pitruzzella +1 760 668 6489
Space Theodore Plunkett +1 952 828 3016
Space Steven Pollinger +1 512 692 8702
Space John Reich +1 612 332 5300
Space Louis Riley +1 512 228 5640
Space Richard Roddy +1 919 363 7258
Space Arnold +1 905 316 2290
Space David Schmaltz +1 612 336 4617
Space Cecil Schmidt +1 612 747 2679
Space Mark Schuman +1 612 436 9600
Space Michael Schumann +1 612 455 3803
Space Gregory Sebald +1 612 332 5300
Space Janice Sharp +1 626 577 5728
Space MARK SKOOG +1 612 371 5240
Space +1 913 766 7366
Space Scott Stinebruner +1 513 241 2324
Space John Sumner +1 612 332 8200
Space John +1 612 332 5300
Space David Tellekson +1 206 389 4560
Space Albert Lee Underhill +1 602 388 4020 aunderhill@underhilllaw.net
Space John Derek Vandenburgh +1 612 332 5300 +3329 332 332 9081
Space Paul Welter +1 612 336 4600
Space Douglas Williams +1 612 367 8787
Space Gregory Wood +1 213 625 5005
Space Min Xu +1 612 752 7367
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Dettmer, David R., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date August 20, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 18799.79(TT1
Confirmation Number 3703
Group Art Unit 2646
Class / Sub-Class 379 / 388
  Entries (194) Tab Overlap Assignments (8) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
        Dispatch to FDC
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
          Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
            Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
              Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                Response to Amendment under Rule 312
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Pubs Case Remand to TC
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/25/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Issue Fee Payment Received
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                          Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                              Specification (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NA
                                Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312) (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IFEE
                                  Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Response to Reasons for Allowance
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Issue Fee Payment Verified
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                            Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                              Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
                                                Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                  Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                    Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                      Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
                                                        Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (3 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Mail Notice of Allowance
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Correspondence Address Change
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - EBCC.AD
                                                                Notice of Change of Address placed in File Wrapper due to EBC Customer Number update (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    IFW TSS Processing by Tech Center Complete
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Workflow incoming amendment IFW
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                        Fee Worksheet (SB06) (3 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                          Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                              Claims (4 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
                                                                                Amendment After Final (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                  Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                        Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - ANE.I
                                                                                          Amendment After Final or under 37CFR 1.312, initialed by the examiner. (1 Page)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                            Non Patent Literature (2 Pages)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                              List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (7 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                      Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                        Non Patent Literature (10 Pages)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (5 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                            Claims (7 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A.NE
                                                                                                              Amendment After Final (1 Page)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                  Final Rejection (27 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                    Final Rejection
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                        Workflow incoming amendment IFW
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                          Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                            Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                              Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                    Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                      Non Patent Literature (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                        List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                          Non-Final Rejection (17 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                Appeal Brief Filed
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.B
                                                                                                                                                  Appeal Brief Filed (21 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - N/AP
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appeal Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                        Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                                                                          Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                            Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                  Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                    Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                        Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                                          Final Rejection (24 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/4/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                  Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                    Claims (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - NPL
                                                                                                                                                                                          Non Patent Literature (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                              List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Non-Final Rejection (22 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                      BPAI Decision - Examiner Affirmed in Part
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - APDA
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Patent Board Decision - Examiner Affirmed (15 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail BPAI Decision on Appeal - Affirmed in Part
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assignment of Appeal Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Examiner's Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - APEA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief (13 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Examiner's Answer to Appeal Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of Address (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - AP.B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal Brief Filed (22 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal Brief Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Extension of Time (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - N/AP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appeal Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appeal Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - CTAV
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Advisory Action (PTOL-303) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Rejection (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Examiner's search strategy and results (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Change of Address (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Claims (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Reference (9 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None Prior Art - FOR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Reference (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Extension of Time (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Formal Drawings Required (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Prior Art - 1449
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Prior Art - 892
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection (12 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Correspondence Address Change
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - C.AD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of Address (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - PC/I
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Preliminary Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - A.PE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Preliminary Amendment (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: None Prosecution - IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Form (SB08) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reference capture on IDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Captured on Microfilm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Worksheet (SB06) (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bibliographic Data Sheet (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Abstract (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Claims (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Specification (22 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Drawings-only black and white line drawings (10 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmittal of New Application (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Index of Claims (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?