System For Converting Media Content For Interactivetv Use

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08933666
Examiner Vivek Srivastava, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Vivek Srivastava
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wistendahl, Douglass A., Applicant

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Anderson +1 414 297 5740
Space George C Beck +1 202 945 6191 +1 202 672 5399 gbeck@foley.com
Space CHRISTOPHER MAX COLICE +1 617 502 3287
Space TROY D, SMITH +1 312 832 5389
Space Simon Elliott +1 202 295 4726
Space JAMES P. EWING +1 404 815 6494
Space Samantha Garner +1 202 295 4721
Space Rebecca L. Hays +1 608 257 5035
Space Kevin Henry +1 617 502 3289
Space Michael R Houston +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 mhouston@foley.com
Space Paul S. Hunter +1 608 258 4292 +1 608 258 4258 phunter@foley.com
Space CHRISTOPHER L. KALAFUT. +1 608 258 4286
Space MARK E. KASSEL +1 608 258 4272
Space JULIA KORNILOVA +1 414 319 7312
Space Nicholas M. Lagerwall +1 608 258 4466
Space John D Lanza +1 617 248 5000 jlanza@foley.com
Space Glenn Law +1 202 672 5426
Space John M. Lazarus +1 414 271 2400 +1 414 297 4900
Space JEFFREY R. LOMPREY. +1 608 258 4288
Space DAVID G. LUETTGEN +1 414 297 5769
Space James P. Mcparland +1 608 258 4226
Space Joseph P. Meara +1 608 257 5035
Space Steve Nickels +1 608 258 4238
Space ALEX Y. NIE +1 650 251 1124
Space George Quillin +1 202 672 5300 gquillin@foley.com
Space Daniel E. Rose +1 617 342 4000
Space MARCUS W. SPROW +1 313 234 7150
Space STEPHANIE H. VAVRA +1 414 319 7305
Space Charles A. Wiltbank +1 608 258 4479
Space Bruce Wu 1 +1 +1 +1
Space JOSEPH N. ZIEBERT +1 414 297 5768
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Wistendahl, Douglass A., Greenwich, CT (US)
Filing Date September 19, 1997
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 098888-7099
Confirmation Number 6654
Group Art Unit 2611
Class / Sub-Class 725 / 112
Timeline
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Assignments (5) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Formal Drawings Required
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Formal Drawings Required
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Preexamination Location Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?