Extended Spatial Acquisition Method For Tracking Antennas

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08942072
Examiner Mark Hellner, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Mark Hellner
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dybdal, Robert B., Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Dybdal, Robert B., Palos Verdes Estates, CA (US)
Filing Date October 1, 1997
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-325
Confirmation Number 7715
Group Art Unit 3662
Class / Sub-Class 342 / 359
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming petition IFW
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Incoming Correspondence - Begin
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Incoming Correspondence - Finish
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/2/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?